Winnett v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Defendant: Rogers, James Brown and Danny Burl
Case Number: 2:2011cv00032
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 125 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 124 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/2/12. (vjt)
February 6, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 120 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 119 MOTION to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/6/12. (vjt)
December 15, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 108 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 102 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Donald Winnett is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections; Objections to R&R due 12/9/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/11. (vjt)
August 9, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying pltf of his opportunity to respond to defts' 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 14 days of this Order; pltf is also directed to file a statement setting forth the facts which he thinks need to be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/9/11. (vjt)
May 2, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 31 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/2/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winnett v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers
Represented By: Amanda Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Represented By: Amanda Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Represented By: Amanda Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?