Moh et al v. Rush Trucking Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Pearlene Moh and Felicia Smith
Defendant: Rush Trucking Corporation and Maria Romero
Case Number: 2:2011cv00212
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement among the parties. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/18/13. (kpr)
February 6, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER a settlement has been reached in this case and pursuant to a Confidentiality Agreement the content of the settlement shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/06/2013. (kcs)
February 5, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to Amended General Order No. 54, counsel and their staff are authorized to bring electronic devices into the courthouse for the 2/6/2013 settlement conference. Counsel should present this Order to Court Security Personnel at the security checkpoint. Re: 56 Notice of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/05/2013. (kcs)
January 22, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Seal plaintiffs' response in opposition to defts' motion for partial summary judgment and the supporting exhibits and pleadings, including pltf's response to defts' statement of undisputed facts and pltfs' statement of undisputed facts, and supporting brief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/22/13. (kpr)
January 10, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Seal and remove from public access the exhibits attached to defts Rush Trucking Corporation's and Maria Romero's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/9/13. (kpr)
September 25, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER amending the Court's previous 34 Order. The ddl for filing the amended complaint is 10/4/12. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/25/12. (kpr)
August 16, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 23 Motion for Leave to File documents under seal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/16/112. (kpr)
April 20, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/20/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moh et al v. Rush Trucking Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlene Moh
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Smith
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Trucking Corporation
Represented By: Don Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: James Tucker Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?