Manfre v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Gerard Manfre
Defendant: Johnson, USA, Timothy C Outlaw, D W Heuett, Weeks, N Shah, Robbie Taylor, Hipolito Matos, N Peikar, Gaia, Jerald Jones, Vitritsky, Brandy Moore, Manuel P Coll and Kathleen Maples
Case Number: 2:2012cv00050
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 160 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/5/2014. (ks)
June 4, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 127 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Shah. Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/4/2013. (mcz)
May 20, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (dmn) (Docket text modified on 5/20/2013, per instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
May 13, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 104 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety. The 65 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Coll is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/13/2013. (dmn)
May 7, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 124 Partial Report and Recommendations. The 60 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Taylor and Gaia is granted, and Plaintiff's claims against these Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/7/2013. (dmn)
March 19, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Seal Exhibit B to 75 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Behalf of Separate Defendant Hipolito Matos M.D.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/19/13. (kpr)
March 18, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion to Seal Exhibit C of 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Behalf of Separate Defendant Hipolito Matos M.D.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/18/13. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 49 Partial Report and Recommendations. The 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Outlaw and Heuett is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/12/2012. (dmn)
August 14, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 Answer to Complaint directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Niharika Shah, Nader Peikar, and Cynthia Gaia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/14/12. (kpr)
May 21, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 and dismissing the United States of America from this action, for failure to state a claim and as immune from liability. Count II of plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/21/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manfre v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D W Heuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipolito Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Peikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitritsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel P Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gerard Manfre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?