Peone v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Everett T Peone
Defendant: USA, United States Bureau of Prisons, Hipolito Matos, T C Outlaw, David Weitzmen and Shaw
Case Number: 2:2012cv00083
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 114 motion for relief from judgment; granting in part and denying in part 115 motion to withdraw docket entry 109 and to enforce settlement agreement; and granting 116 motion for leave to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/13/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 joint motion to dismiss with prejudice. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the settlement agreement for a period of 90 days from the date of this Order to enforce the terms of the agreement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/19/2019. (jbh)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER setting trial location in the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, Courtroom 4C, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/28/13. (kpr)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING 42 Initial Scheduling Order. A Final Scheduling Order will be issued. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/27/13. (kpr)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 33 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; directing the Clerk to reclassify this case as filed pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act; and setting aside service of Defendants Matos, Outlaw, Weitzmen, and Shaw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/7/2013. (srw)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER declining to adopt the 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Everett T Peone. This matter is referred to Judge Volpe for recommended disposition, as appropriate. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/3/12. (kpr)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER referring 9 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Everett T Peone to Magistrate Judge Joe Volpe for consideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/2/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peone v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett T Peone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipolito Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weitzmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?