Lewis v. Green et al

Plaintiff: Arthur C Lewis, Jr
Defendant: Charlotte Green, Harris, C Davis, Ball, Carlo, Strickland, Gardner, Hughes, Murry, Arkansas Department of Correction, Horton and Corizon
Case Number: 2:2013cv00073
Filed: June 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 121 Motion to Alter Judgment and for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/25/2015. (jak)
September 11, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 119 Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. All relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/2015. (ks)
December 9, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to 100 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/09/2014. (kcs)
June 5, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. It is therefore ordered that: (1) Defendants' 56 motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and den ied in part. (2) Lewis's claims against Green, Gardner, Davis, and Horton are dismissed without prejudice due to lack of exhaustion. (3) Lewis may proceed with his inadequate medical care and corrective inaction claims against Ball, Hughes, Butler, Strickland, Yarbrough, and Harris. (4) It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/2014. (ks)
March 11, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Latrice Harris, Charlotte Green, Strickland, Dottie Yarbrough, Don Wesley Ball, Joseph Hughes, Charlotte Gardner, Debra Horton, C hiquita Davis, Quilble Butler and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in 56 being admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/11/2014. (kcs)
February 11, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's claims against Carlo and Murry are dismissed without prejudice due to lack of service. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/11/2014. (ks)
September 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, the Clerk is directed to correct name of deft Yarbrough; pltf's claims against deft ADC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the claims against deft Corizon Inc are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against defts Green, Harris, Davis, Ball, Carlo, Strickland, Gardner, Hughes, Murry, Horton, Butler, and Yarbrough; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint (pages 1 through 42), amended complaint, and this Order on these defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/20/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur C Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?