Banks v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Eugene Banks
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, T Outlaw, Nadar Peikar, Does, USA, FCC Forrest City, Graham, B Hoy, M Rios, T Houston, Gillardo and S Norris
Case Number: 2:2013cv00121
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 57 the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Darlene Gallardo, Theron Houston, Brenda Hoy, Steven Norris, T.C. Outlaw, Nader Peikar, and Mary Ellen Rivers-Gr aham; and dismissing 6 Banks's complaint, without prejudice with respect to his claims against the unnamed Does and the USA, and with prejudice in all other respects. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action would be frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2015. (kdr)
March 31, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting 26 defendant USA's motion for summary judgment, and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the USA, without prejudice; granting 29 the motion for sum mary judgment filed by defendants Darlene Gallardo, Theron Houston, Brenda Hoy, Steven Norris, T.C. Outlaw, Nader Peikar, and Mary Ellen Rivers-Graham, to the extent that plaintiff's Bivens claims against them in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice and denied in all other respects; and granting 32 Misty Rios's motion for summary judgment, and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Rios, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/31/2014. (kdr)
December 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the Federal Bureau of Prisons and FCC Forrest City, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/2013. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Eugene Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadar Peikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCC Forrest City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?