Jones v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Jones
Defendant: Danny Burl, David Mills, Brett Butler, Chloe Knudsen and Royry Griffin
Case Number: 2:2014cv00136
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 64 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 60 motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he is first required to reimburse Defendants $ ;190.75 for the court reporter's fees they incurred on July 8, 2015. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/28/2015. (ks)
July 21, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/21/2015. (mcz)
February 19, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants Danny Burl, Rory Griffin and David Mills' 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and they are DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failur e to exhaust his administrative remedies against them. Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to alter the docket to reflect that "Royry Griffin" is appropriately "Rory Griffin." The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/19/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chloe Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royry Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?