Glasper v. Hughes Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Charlie Glasper
Defendant: Hughes Arkansas, City of, Lawrence Owens, Wright, Dustin McCluskey and John Does
Case Number: 2:2015cv00186
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Consistent with this Court's 48 prior Order, the Court enters judgment in favor of separate defendants the City of Hughes, Arkansas; Lawrence Owens, individually and in his official capacity as the Mayor of the City of Hughes ; Dustin McCluskey, individually and in his official capacity as former Chief of Police for the City of Hughes; James Wright, Jr., in his official capacity only as a police officer for the City of Hughes; and James Wright, Sr., individually and in hi s official capacity as a police officer for the City of Hughes, and denies plaintiff Charlie Glasper's requests for relief against these separate defendants. Consistent with this Court's 62 prior Order, the Court enters default judgment a gainst separate defendant James Wright, Jr., in his individual capacity. On claims against James Wright, Jr., in his individual capacity, the Court awards judgment in favor of Mr. Glasper as follows: $121,177.30 in medical expenses, $37,377 .00 in lost wages for the years 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018, $250,000.00 for pain, suffering, and mental anguish, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, the Court awards post-judgment interest at a rate of 0.16% per year until judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/31/2020. (jbh)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DEFAULT ORDER directing the Clerk to enter default against separate defendant James Wright, Jr., in his individual capacity. Upon the Clerk's entry of default, the Court intends to enter a separate default judgment consistent with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2020. (jbh)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER granting 27 the City defendants' motion for summary judgment in its entirety and granting in part and denying in part the 30 motion for summary judgment filed by Officers Wright, Jr. and Wright, Sr. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasper v. Hughes Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Glasper
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin McCluskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?