Gonzalez v. Rivera et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Defendant: C Rivera, Thomas Johnson, Landers and Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv00119
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 44 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendants' 30 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Gonzalez's retaliation claims against Rivera, Does, and Kruger are dismissed without prejudice. Kruger is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. Gonzalez may proceed with his free exercise, establishment, and equal protection claims against Rivera, Johnson, Landers, and Does. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/24/2017. (mcz)
May 25, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety 36 the Recommendation; denying 23 the motion for a preliminary injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/20174. (kdr)
January 12, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety the 6 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects. Gonzalez may proceed with this First Amendment religion claims, RFRA claim, Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim, and First Ame ndment claim against Rivera, Johnson, Landers, and Does. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons on Rivera, Johnson, and Landers and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, 1 complaint, 4 amended complaint, and this Order on them, without prepa yment of fees and costs or security therefor. Gonzalez's RLUIPA claim against all defendants is dismissed with prejudice. Gonzalez's Fourteenth Amendment due process claim against all Defendants is dismissed without prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/12/2017. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Rivera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?