Nichols v. Drummond et al
Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Patrick Drummond and Hurstine
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 JUDICIAL NOTICE to the Court by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docs. #19 and #21 by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to the Court by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED OBJECTION to #14 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 Statement of Necessity. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the party filer as Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (jak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF NECESSITY re #19 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 8/16/2019 to indicate the party filer)(jak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION to #14 Report and Recommendations by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion. Objections due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2019. (jak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT of #15 Supplement filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice #2 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/31/2019. (lej)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 JUDICAL NOTICE to the Court by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #2 Complaint and #7 Amended Complaint by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Injuries by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (llg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Ineffective Treatment Plan by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (kdr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Plaintiff must submit the statutory filing fee of $400 to the Clerk, noting the above case style and number, within 14 days of the date of this order if he wishes to proceed with this action. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/8/2019. (lej)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Mack Nichols, Jr. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Drummond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?