Thomas v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Thomas
Defendant: Rick Seawel, John Does, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas, Matthew Albrecht and AT&T Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv00076
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #15 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER reassigning this case to the docket of Chief U.S. District Judge D.P. Marshall Jr., by chip exchange. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/23/2019. (jbh)
August 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case by Eddie Thomas; Case Number 2:18-cv-00067 (Sutter, Luther)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Rick Seawel, AT&T Corp, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas, Matthew Albrecht, #10 Amended Complaint filed by Eddie Thomas. (Mathis, Andre)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by AT&T Corp, Matthew Albrecht, Rick Seawel, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas (Mathis, Andre)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Eddie Thomas (Sutter, Luther)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Notice of Related Case with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Eddie Thomas(Sutter, Luther)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rick Seawel, AT&T Corp, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas, Matthew Albrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 = 2013 Felony Information against Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 = Plaintiff's May 2018 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 = July 30, 2018 Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims)(Mathis, Andre)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AT&T Corp, Matthew Albrecht, Rick Seawel, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas (Mathis, Andre)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by AT&T Corp, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas (Mathis, Andre)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre B. Mathis on behalf of AT&T Corp, Matthew Albrecht, Rick Seawel, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas (Mathis, Andre)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles William Hill on behalf of AT&T Corp, Matthew Albrecht, Rick Seawel, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas (Hill, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Thomas. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas served on 7/8/2019. (Sutter, Luther)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Thomas. AT&T Corp served on 7/8/2019. (Sutter, Luther)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT by Lucien Ramseur Gillham. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Eddie Thomas. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072802.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Seawel
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: Charles William Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company of Arkansas
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: Charles William Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albrecht
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: Charles William Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: Charles William Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Thomas
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?