Lane v. Lay et al
Plaintiff: Adam Lane
Defendant: Parham, Lay, Arkansas Department of Corrections, Neely and Branch
Case Number: 2:2020cv00148
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Branch, Lay, Neely, and Parham. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Warden Lay, Warden Branch, Chaplain Neely, and Chaplain Parham; directing the USMS to serve the summons and #2 Complaint, #6 the Court's 8/14/2020 Order and this Order, on them through the ADC Compliance Division, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/14/2020. (kdr)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 partial recommendation. Lane's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against Lay, Branch, Neely, and Parham go forward. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2020. (jak)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Lane be allowed to proceed with his First, Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims against Warden Lay, Warden Branch, Chaplain Neely, and Chaplain Parham, and that the Complaint be served on them; Lane's claim against the ADC be dismissed, with prejudice; and the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/20/2020. (kdr)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account until a total of $350 has been paid; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the EARU and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/20/2020. (kdr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Adam Lane. (ljb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Adam Lane. (ljb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Lane. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Lay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?