Winders v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Winders, Sr
Defendant: Zane Boyd and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2009cv00097
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 29 Order of Dismissal entered this day, this Section 1983 action is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2010. (jct)
January 7, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to 24 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment within 30 days of the entry of this Order, together with a Statement of Disputed Material Facts that comply with the Fed.R.Civ.P.56, Local Rule 56.1, & the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in dismissal of this action, or, all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/7/2010. (jct)
August 12, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the parties shall complete discovery by 11/11/2009 & file any dispositive motions by 12/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/12/09. (jct)
July 21, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, a (freeworld) Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, & a Statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit. Plaintiff is reminded that the failu re to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/21/09. (jct) Modified on 7/29/2009 to reflect that the portion directing Plaintiff to file an Amended (freeworld) In Forma Pauperis Application is VACATED pursuant to 11 Order (jct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winders v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Winders, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?