Bland v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Rickey Bland
Defendant: Richard D Busby, Zane Boyd, Theresa Bonner, Willie Taylor and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00205
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 57 Order entered this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court further certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order & Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous & not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/29/2010. (jct)
November 23, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure Plaintiff's attendance at the 12/6/10 pre-jury evidentiary hearing in Little Rock, & to bring Plaintiff's institutional & medical records to the hearing. Due to the limited nature of the evidentiary hearing, re 45 Witness List, all of Plaintiff's propsed witnesses are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/23/2010. (jct)
March 9, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge H. David Young in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 29 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss Doe Defendants is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against the Doe Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, & the names of the Does are removed as party Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bland v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Rickey Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?