Chism et al v. Life Strategies of Arkansas LLC

Plaintiff: Thelma Chism and Nathan Williams
Defendant: Life Strategies of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00225
Filed: December 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 40 Order entered this date, the Court dismisses the Plaintiffs' first amended complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2011. (jct)
March 17, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER Conditionally Certifying Case as FLSA Collective Action directing Defendant to provide Plaintiffs' counsel, within 10 days of the entry of this Consent Order, a list of names, last known addresses & telephone numbers for all LSA employees referenced. Plaintiffs will mail the court approved Notice on 4/2/10, & the opt-in period will run until 6/16/10. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/10. (jct)
February 1, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/1/2010. (jct)
January 27, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to strike 9 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/27/10. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chism et al v. Life Strategies of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Chism
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Williams
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Strategies of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?