Hall et al v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Ted Hall, Sydney Tate and Herbert Holmes
Defendant: Richard Busby, Terresa Bonner, Zane Boyd and Mobley
Case Number: 3:2010cv00082
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 32 Order of Dismissal entered this date, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED & ADJUDGED that, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), this case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to Plaintiff's failure to timely & properly comply with the Court's 10/29/10 Order. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/1/2010. (jct)
October 29, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 26 Notice of Change of Address filed by Ted Hall, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a (freeworld) Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to file the Amended Application w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, & is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/29/2010. (jct)
June 22, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs Sydney Tate & Herbert Holmes are DISMISSED, WI THOUT PREJUDICE, due to their failure to comply with the Court's Order; (2) Defendant Richard Busby is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff Hall's food claim is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff Hall shall PROCEED with his shower, inadequate medical care & tuberculosis claims against Defendants Bonner, Boyd & Mobley; (3) The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; (4) The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Defendants Bonner, Boyd & Mobley, & the U.S. Marshal to serve said Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/22/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?