Perry et al v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Eric D Perry and Maurio Heron
Defendant: Dick Busby, Thereasa Bonner, Zane Boyd, Mobely, Beezly and Long
Case Number: 3:2010cv00097
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 47 Order, that this case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, & Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on all claims set forth herein. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment & the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/19/2011. (jct)
September 27, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect that Defendant Thereasa Bonner is "Theresa Bonner". The parties shall complete discovery on or before 12/23/10 & file any dispositive motions on or before 1/24/11. (Discovery due by 12/23/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/27/2010. (jct)
July 8, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, consistent with 22 Order entered this date, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED & ADJUDGED that this case is VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/8/2010. (jct)
June 23, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Partial Dismissal, pursuant to Separate Plaintiff Maurio Heron's failure to comply with 7 Order, Plaintiff Heron is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order of Partial Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/23/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurio Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thereasa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beezly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?