Venzant v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Larry Darnell Venzant
Defendant: Coleman, Teressa Bonner, Gamble, Mobley and Hall
Case Number: 3:2011cv00116
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Larry Darnell Venzant, in accordance with 43 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment entered this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/23/2012. (jct)
December 21, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 34 Defendants' MOTION to Extend Time. The Clerk is requested to update the docket to correctly reflect the complete names of Defendants Ronnie Coleman, Shenisa Mobley, Ronnie Gammon (sued as Gamble) & Willa Hall. Plaintiff is given the opportunity to file a response opposing 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Venzant's response is due w/i 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)
December 13, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions. (Dispositive Motions are now due by 12/16/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/13/2011. (jct)
November 29, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 25 Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2011; defts are directed to provide the Court with full names of Sgts. Gamble, Mobley and Hall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venzant v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Darnell Venzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teressa Bonner
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamble
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?