Flenoy v. Soward et al

Plaintiff: Brad Flenoy
Defendant: Peggy Soward, Ernest McKay, Dale Cook, Luther Whitfield, John Thrasher and Kenneth Melvin
Case Number: 3:2012cv00071
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to 36 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with Fed R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Furth er, Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in all of the facts set forth in Defendants summary judgment being deemed admitted by Plaintiff or the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/8/2013. (jak)
April 26, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 11 Answer, directing the Clerk to correctly identify Defendants Peggy Soward, John Thrasher, Kenneth Melvin, Ernest McKay, Dale Cook & Luther Whitfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/26/2012. (jct)
April 24, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER that the parties shall complete discovery on or before 10/20/2012, & file any dispositive motions on or before 11/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/24/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flenoy v. Soward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Flenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Soward
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest McKay
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thrasher
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Melvin
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?