Kelley v. Nitrogen Solutions LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wesley Kelley
Defendant: Nitrogen Solutions LLC, Michael Stickler, Matthew McCaughey, John McCaughey, Joan Khilling and Michael Jacques
Case Number: 3:2012cv00246
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the findings of fact and conclusions of law, judgment is entered in favor of the defendants on the claims of Wesley Kelley; and judgment is entered in favor of Wesley Kelley on the counterclaim of Nitrogen Solutions, LLC. The complaint and the counterclaim are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/24/2013. (jak)
October 2, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that the bench trial in this case will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Wednesday, October 23, 2013, in Jonesboro Courtroom 324. Counsel should be present by 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2013. (jak)
September 17, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. With respect to remaining issues, this action is scheduled for a bench trial, and in the interest of judicial economy the Court will defer addressing the disputed issues until all of the evidence has been received. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/17/2013. (jak)
September 3, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Kelley's alternative request that the trial be bifurcated is likewise denied. Finally, the Court believes that the counterclaim states a claim upon which relief can be granted. Therefore, Kelly's alternative request for a more definite statement is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/3/2013. (jak)
January 23, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend. The proposed amended answer must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/23/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Nitrogen Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Kelley
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Cheslee Sizemore Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nitrogen Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McCaughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCaughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Khilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?