Warren v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Henry W Warren
Defendant: Doe, Dale Cook, Carr Marvell, Matthew Davis and Luther Whitfield
Case Number: 3:2014cv00128
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 43 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/27/2016. (jak)
November 9, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Warren to provide notice of his new address to the Court within thirty days of entry of this Order if he wants to continue with this lawsuit. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/9/2015. (jak)
October 21, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Warren to file a response opposing the motion 32 . To be considered, the response must be filed within fourteen days of this Order. If Mr. Warren files a response, he must also file a separate, short statement setting forth the d isputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. While Mr. Warren is not required to file a response to the Defendants' motion for summary judgment, if he does not respond, the Court can assume that the facts set out in the Defendants' Statement of Facts, 34 , are true. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/21/2015. (jak)
April 22, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the Partial Recommended Dispositions, 24 , 25 , as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against the Doe defendant and defendant Matthew Davis are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/22/2015. (jak)
December 8, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety. Plaintiff Henry W. Warren's claims against defendant Dale Cook are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/8/2014. (jak)
June 6, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Amend. His amended complaint should be filed as a supplement to his original complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Davis, Marvell, and Whitfield. The Court will address Mr. Warren's claims against Defendant Cook in a separate recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/6/2014. (jak)
May 14, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Warren to amend his complaint within thirty days to cure the defects identified by the Court. His failure to comply with the Court Order could result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry W Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr Marvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?