Stinson et al v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Stinson, Mark Barker and Marcus Brown
Defendant: Mike Allen, Ronnie Coleman, Milo and Ramsey
Case Number: 3:2014cv00308
Filed: December 24, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 31 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/14/2015. (jak)
July 30, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Stinson to provide the Court notice of his new address within thirty days of entry of this Order. If Mr. Stinson is no longer incarcerated, he must also submit an updated in forma pauperis application, which the Clerk is directed to attach to this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/30/2015. (jak)
July 20, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for defendant Milo. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for this Defendant without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate Allen, Coleman, and Ramsey as defendants. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/20/2015. (jak)
March 20, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Barker's claims for failure to comply with the Court's February 5, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2015. (jak)
February 9, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Brown's claims based on his failure to comply with the January 5, 2015 Court Order. Local Rule 5.5. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/9/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson et al v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?