Brown v. Crittenden County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Brown
Defendant: Crittenden County, Arkansas, Crittenden County Detention Center, Michael Allen and Doe Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv00150
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. All allegations, except Plaintiff's claims of failure to protect and denial of medical care and treatment, be dismissed without prejudice, for failure to comply with F ED.R.CIV.P. 8 and for failure state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendants Crittenden County, Arkansas, Crittenden County Detention Center, Michael Allen, Doe Corporation, Teresa Bonner, and Christy Childers, be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/14/2015. (jak)
August 26, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for the Defendants Sgt. Milo, Ronnie Coleman, and Officer Bert. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint, 6 , and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/26/2015. (jak)
June 5, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Brown to either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within thirty days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/5/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Crittenden County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?