Glaze v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Defendant: Mike Allen, Ronnie Coleman, Beard, Chris Chatters, Jane Does, John Doe, Todd Grooms, Hines, Dexter, Stone, Milo, Brown, Rik Ramsey, Hunt, McConnell, Ralo, Luke, Littlejohn, Dulaney, Joe Rogers, Crittenden County Sheriff Department, Wirth, West Memphis City of, Terresa Bonner and Jeff Thomas
Case Number: 3:2015cv00161
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 71 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendants' 65 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/1/2016. (mcz)
November 23, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. Mr. Glaze has up to and including 12/14/2016, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/23/2016. (jak)
April 26, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 Partial Recommended Disposition, declining to adopt the second Partial Recommended Disposition, 52 , and adopting in its entirety the third Partial Recommended Disposition, 53 . The City of West Memphis's motion to dismiss is granted, 33 . The Doe defendants in this case are dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/26/2016. (jak)
January 5, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Glaze may proceed on his claims of excessive force, deliberate indifference, failure to protect, due process violations, retaliation, and unconstitutional conditions of confinement alleged ly arising out of the May 18, 2015, incidents. All other claims included in his Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Accordingly, separate defendants Mike Allen, Beard, Chris Chatters, Doe County Prosecutor, Brown, Rik Ramsey, Hunt, McConnell, Ralo, Luke, Littlejohn, Dulaney, Joe Rogers, Crittenden County Sheriff Department, Wirth, and Lucas are dismissed without prejudice as defendants from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/5/2016. (jak)
December 10, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion. The Clerk is directed to terminate Christy Childers as a defendant and to prepare a summons for Defendant Marni Dickerson. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, 2 Complaint, 8 A mended Complaint, and this Order on Defendant Dickerson without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Mr. Glaze's request for a copy of the rules is denied. The Court cannot provide a copy of the Federal Rules, but the Detention Center shoul d have a copy of the Rules that Mr. Glaze can access. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Detention Center. If Mr. Glaze continues to have problems accessing the Federal Rules, he may file another motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/10/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving Mr. Glaze one hundred and twenty days to use the discovery process to find valid addresses for Defendants Stone and Childers and to file a "Motion for Service". Mr. Glaze is instructed not to file discovery requests or discove ry responses with the Court unless they are necessary to support a motion or a response to a motion, or to comply with a Court order. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare a summons for the City of West Memphis. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, with any attachments, 2 and 8 , and a summons for this Defendant without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/2015. (jak)
September 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Ronnie Coleman, Christy Childers, Todd Grooms, Hines, Dexter, Stone, Bridget Milo, Terresa Bonner, Jeff Thomas, Mandy Childers, the City of West Memphis, and Crittenden County. The Uni ted States Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, with any attachments, 2 and 8 , and a summons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/16/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chatters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rik Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littlejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dulaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?