Berry v. Doss et al

Plaintiff: Willard Eugene Berry
Defendant: Brian Doss, Carol McFarlin, Jermey Sparks, Henson, Coleman, Hardesty and Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00378
Filed: November 27, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 31 partial recommended disposition in all respects. Berry's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Doss, McFarlin, Sparks, and Hardesty will proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/2016. (jak)
February 26, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for Defendant Jeremy Sparks. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, amended complaint, 2 & 5 , and a summons for Defendant Sparks without requiring prepayment of fees an d costs or security. The Clerk is also directed to update the docket sheet with Mr. Berry's new address, Arkansas Department of Correction, Tucker Unit, Post Office Box 240, Tucker, Arkansas, 72168, as indicated in his recent filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/26/2016. (jak)
February 10, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Berry to notify the Court whether Defendant Sparks is an ADC inmate or officer within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with the Court's order could result in the dismissal of Mr. Berry's claims against Defendant Sparks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/10/2016. (jak)
January 26, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the partial recommended disposition in all respects, 6 . Plaintiff Willard Berry's claims against defendants Henson and Coleman are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claim that the defendants failed to provide him with adequate medical treatment is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/26/2016. (jak)
January 8, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue summons for Defendants Doss, McFarlin, and Hardesty. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, amended complaint with any attachments, 2 & 5 , and summonses for these Defendan ts without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service for these Defendants should be through Wade Hodge, General Counsel for the ACC, Department of Community Correction, Two Union Natl Plaza, 3rd Floor, 105 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/8/2016. (jak)
December 18, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Doss, McFarlin, and Hardesty. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, 2 , amended complaint, 5 , and summonses for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Mr. Berry's claims against the remaining Defendants will be addressed in a separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/18/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Doss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard Eugene Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermey Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?