Ag Resource Management LLC v. Southern Bank

Plaintiff: Ag Resource Management LLC
Defendant: Southern Bank
Case Number: 3:2016cv00276
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Third-Party Plaintiff Southern Bank and against Third- Party Defendants B.C. Farms, LLC and Boddy G. Clause, jointly and severally, for the sum of $131,480.68 plus post judgment interest at the rate of 1.22% per annum until paid. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/24/2017. (jak)
July 7, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 52 Opinion and Order it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Judgment is entered in favor of AG Resource Management LLC against Southern Bank for th e sum of $119,397.32, plus prejudgment interest of $11,633.36, together with post-judgment interest at the rate of 1.22% per annum until paid, along with Plaintiff's costs of $400 for the filing fee and $50 for the ser vice fee, for all or which execution may issue. It is further ordered and adjudged that Defendant's 38 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Count II of the complaint is dismissed because the claim for common law conversion has been displaced by the Uniform Commercial Code. The remainder of the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/7/2017. (jak)
June 26, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Southern Bank filed a third-party complaint against B.C. Farms, LLC, and Boddy G. Clause. The Clerk of Court listed the first name of Mr. Clause on the docket as Bobby rather than Boddy. The Court directs the Clerk to correct the docket to reflect that Mr. Clause's first name is Boddy. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/2017. (jak)
May 19, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/2017. (jak)
December 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/12/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ag Resource Management LLC v. Southern Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ag Resource Management LLC
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Bank
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?