Barbee v. Big River Steel LLC
Plaintiff: Pierce and Paulette Barbee
Defendant: Big River Steel LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00063
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 42 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 06/20/2019 as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee. (jbh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 41 USCA JUDGMENT as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee: The portion of the district court's judgment below that addressed settled attorney fees is vacated in accordance with the opinion of this court. (cmn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 40 OPINION of USCA as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee. (cmn)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of USCA as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee: On the court's own motion, the show cause order entered on 6/22/2018 is hereby vacated. (mcz)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of USCA as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee: The appellant has failed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the requisite docketing fees. Appellant is directed to show cause, within 14 days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (mcz)
June 22, 2018 Filing 37 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 paid, receipt number LIT067631 re #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee. (mcz)
June 8, 2018 Filing 36 USCA Docketing Letter as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee. USCA Case Number 18-2255. (mcz)
June 7, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #34 Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (editable image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #34 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
June 6, 2018 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Barbee re: #19 Order, #31 Order and #32 Judgment. (mcz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
June 6, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines, #31 Judgment on Attorney Fees, #32 Judgment by Paulette Barbee. (Sanford, Joshua)
May 7, 2018 Filing 32 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2018. (mcz)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting as modified #29 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk to unseal the #30 Proposed Agreement. The Court approves $30,000 as a reasonable amount of attorney's fees and costs in this case. The case will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2018. (mcz)
April 30, 2018 Filing 30 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (fjg) (jak)(Document unsealed pursuant to #31 Order (jak)
April 30, 2018 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement and to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint filed by Paulette Barbee. (fjg)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER substituting Paulette Barbee, Administratrix of the Estate of Kimberly Hope Gillock for Kim Pierce as plaintiff. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/26/2018. (jak)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The stay is lifted. #26 Motion is granted. Please file a notice of the personal representative to complete the substitution, with the order of appointment, acceptance, and letters attached. Motion to approve settlement due by 4/30/2018. The Court appreciates the parties' continued collaboration. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/2018. (jak)
April 16, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Kim Pierce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Mississippi Co Order)(Sanford, Joshua)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint report, No. #24 , appreciated. Motion to substitute, and either a motion to approve new settlement or a motion for scheduling order, due by 16 April 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/19/2018. (slb)
March 15, 2018 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Big River Steel LLC. (Read, Nathan)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint report, No. #22 , noted and appreciated. Further joint report due by 15 March 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2018. (slb)
January 31, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by Big River Steel LLC. (Read, Nathan)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER STAYING CASE: Suggestion of death, No. #20 , noted. Condolences. Motion, No. #20 , granted as modified. Scheduling Order, No. #8 , suspended. Case stayed. Joint status report due by 31 January 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2017. (slb)
December 13, 2017 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT and Request for Continuance by Big River Steel LLC. (Read, Nathan)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Joint motion. Joint status report on where the case is going from here due by 12/13/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
September 1, 2017 Filing 18 ADDENDUM filed by Kim Pierce to #11 Motion to Dismiss. Joint Addendum (Sanford, Joshua)
September 1, 2017 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT. (alm)
September 1, 2017 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT. (alm)
September 1, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit Under Seal re #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Filed by Kim Pierce. (alm)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Joint motion to approve settlement, #11 , noted. The Court needs, and would appreciate, more information. Please file an addendum by 9/1/2017 answering the questions within this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2017. (jak)
August 10, 2017 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
August 10, 2017 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
August 10, 2017 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint filed by Kim Pierce. (fjg)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court notes the parties' joint status report #9 about settlement. The Court must approve the proposed agreement in this FLSA case. Proposed agreement, and any billing records for attorney's fees, must be filed under seal by 8/11/2017. The Court will almost certainly unseal the agreement in due course. If this breaks the deal, the parties should file a status report instead by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2017. (mcz)
July 14, 2017 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Big River Steel LLC. (Read, Nathan)
June 2, 2017 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/14/2017. Bench Trial set for 10/1/2018 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/2/2017. (slb)
May 16, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Big River Steel LLC.(Read, Nathan)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #5 , granted as modified. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 16 May 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/2/2017. (slb)
May 1, 2017 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Big River Steel LLC (Read, Nathan)
May 1, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Read on behalf of Big River Steel LLC (Read, Nathan)
May 1, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathlyn Graves on behalf of Big River Steel LLC (Graves, Kathlyn)
April 4, 2017 Filing 2 CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Kim Pierce. (kdr)
April 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against Big River Steel LLC, filed by Kim Pierce. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT061262. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Big River Steel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Barbee
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big River Steel LLC
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?