Smith et al v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Smith and Tiffany E Smith
Defendant: Sylvia Wear, Cindy Gillespie, Alfred Hogan, Dickie Kennemore, Asa Hutchinson, Ashley Hodges, Tiffany Smithey, Families Inc, Gonzalez, Terry Hodges, Sam Pollock, Arkansas Department of Human Services, John Does, Pamela Smith, Osceola Arkansas, City of, Duncan, Michael Cox, William J Bryant, Jeffrey Drew, Katherine Chalpecka, David Gladden, Sandra Landry and Dee Wallace
Case Number: 3:2019cv00082
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arkansas Department of Human Services, William J Bryant, Katherine Chalpecka, Jeffrey Drew, Cindy Gillespie, Asa Hutchinson, Sylvia Wear. (Jackson, Maryna)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #35 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #33 and #34 Responses. (jak)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #33 and #34 Responses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steele, Larry)(Docket text modified on 7/8/2019 to correct the linkage)(jak)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steele, Larry)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steele, Larry)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motions, Nos. #30 & #31 , granted as modified. Responses to the motions to dismiss due by 5 July 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/21/2019. (slb)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Steele, Larry)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Steele, Larry)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by William J Bryant, Jeffrey Drew, Cindy Gillespie, Asa Hutchinson, Sylvia Wear (Jackson, Maryna)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Arkansas Department of Human Services, Katherine Chalpecka (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jackson, Maryna)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Separate Defendants' motion to file exhibits under seal, No. #25 , is granted. Please send a courtesy copy of the exhibits to chambers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (slb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #25 MOTION for Leave to File. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers to include Asa Hutchinson as marked on the document. (jak)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Arkansas Department of Human Services, Asa Hutchinson, William J Bryant, Katherine Chalpecka, Jeffrey Drew, Cindy Gillespie, Sylvia Wear (Jackson, Maryna) (Docket text modified on 6/13/2019 to correct the party filers) (jak)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion to file sur-reply, No. #23 , denied. The movant gets the last word absent extraordinary circumstances. None are present here. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2019. (slb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to File Sur Reply and Brief by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sur Reply to Families, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Steele, Larry)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #20 , granted as modified. Plaintiffs must complete service on the noted Defendants by 30 August 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/7/2019. (slb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Families Inc. (Thompson, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Extend Time to Perfect Service of Process by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement regarding service of defendants)(Steele, Larry)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Cox, John Does.(Worsham, Rebecca)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda LaFever on behalf of Duncan, Gonzalez, Terry Hodges, Osceola Arkansas, City of (LaFever, Amanda)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Duncan, Gonzalez, Terry Hodges, Osceola Arkansas, City of.(LaFever, Amanda)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #12 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion from separate Defendants due by 14 June 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/31/2019. (slb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steele, Larry)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steele, Larry)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Worsham on behalf of Michael Cox, John Does (Worsham, Rebecca)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading by Arkansas Department of Human Services, William J Bryant, Katherine Chalpecka, Jeffrey Drew, Cindy Gillespie, Asa Hutchinson, Sylvia Wear (Jackson, Maryna)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryna O. Jackson on behalf of Arkansas Department of Human Services, William J Bryant, Katherine Chalpecka, Jeffrey Drew, Cindy Gillespie, Asa Hutchinson, Sylvia Wear (Jackson, Maryna)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint , filed by Mary Louise Smith, Tiffany E Smith. William J. Bryant served on 5/13/2019. (Steele, Larry)(Docket text modified on 5/23/2019 to correct the party that was served)(jak)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint , filed by Mary Louise Smith, Tiffany E Smith. Families Inc served on 5/13/2019. (Steele, Larry)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint , filed by Mary Louise Smith. Robert S. Jones served on 5/13/2019. (Steele, Larry) (Docket text modified on 5/23/2019 to correct the party that was served)(jak)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Families Inc. (Thompson, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Families Inc (Thompson, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Thompson, III on behalf of Families Inc (Thompson, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 and #10 Affidavits of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #8 was modified to correct the party served as Robert S. Jones as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry #10 was modified to correct the party served as William Bryant as marked on the document. (jak)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Louise Smith. Asa Hutchinson served on 5/17/2019. (Steele, Larry)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mary Louise Smith(Steele, Larry)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee received. Receipt number LIT071584 Amount $400.00. (fjg)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mary Louise Smith, Tiffany E Smith. (Fee of $400 received; Summons not issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Wear
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickie Kennemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Smithey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Families Inc
Represented By: Robert F. Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Hodges
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Rebecca Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cox
Represented By: Rebecca Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Bryant
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Drew
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Chalpecka
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany E Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?