Mitchell et al v. Reliance Health Care Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jessie Marie Melton, Mary Molitor, Katherine Jones Mitchell, Michael Askue, Billy Ray Brewer, Tammie Jo Skaggs, Andy Wiggs, Peggy Howerton, Jane Dawn Smith, Martha Gray Donnell, Dale Fountain, Heather Staton, Steve Harrelson, Mike Mims, Betty Sue Bradford, Barbara Ann Phillips, Lois Henley and Kristin McCuistion
Defendant: FPNC Inc, Gena Turner, BVNC Inc, Amy Rollins, Anthony Brandon Adams, Ovation Health Systems Inc, Reliance Health Care Inc, GVNC Inc, John Ellis, SRCNC Inc, NWA Nursing Center LLC, John Doe, SLNC Inc, MHCNC Inc, MHHNC Inc, Nashville Nursing and Rehab Inc, Westwood Health and Rehab Inc, Andrea Neil, Bryan M Adams, TXKNC Inc, GNNC Inc, RHC Operations Inc, Eagle Health Systems Inc, WCNC Inc and Beebe Retirement Center Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00370
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' reply is due by 2/21/2020. The Court will not grant any further extensions. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/14/2020. (pgt)
February 14, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Extend Time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR REMAND, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court () by Reliance Health Care Inc (Thompson, Michael)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due on or before 2/14/2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/29/2020. (pgt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Brandon Adams, Bryan M Adams, BVNC Inc, Beebe Retirement Center Inc, Eagle Health Systems Inc, John Ellis, FPNC Inc, GNNC Inc, GVNC Inc, MHCNC Inc, MHHNC Inc, NWA Nursing Center LLC, Nashville Nursing and Rehab Inc, Andrea Neil, Ovation Health Systems Inc, RHC Operations Inc, Reliance Health Care Inc, Amy Rollins, SLNC Inc, SRCNC Inc, TXKNC Inc, Gena Turner, WCNC Inc, Westwood Health and Rehab Inc (Marts, Gary)
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Remand to State Court filed by Katherine Jones Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit - Steve Harrelson)(Balette, Jacques)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Katherine Jones Mitchell (Balette, Jacques)
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/19/2020 and Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 09:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/30/2019. (hml)
December 26, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Anthony Brandon Adams, Bryan M Adams, BVNC Inc, Beebe Retirement Center Inc, John Doe, Eagle Health Systems Inc, John Ellis, FPNC Inc, GNNC Inc, GVNC Inc, MHCNC Inc, MHHNC Inc, NWA Nursing Center LLC, Nashville Nursing and Rehab Inc, Andrea Neil, Ovation Health Systems Inc, RHC Operations Inc, Reliance Health Care Inc, Amy Rollins, SLNC Inc, SRCNC Inc, TXKNC Inc, Gena Turner, WCNC Inc, Westwood Health and Rehab Inc.(Henry, Judy)
December 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint and #3 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to correct the description of the document filed as #2 "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT" and #3 "FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT". (thd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Westwood Health and Rehab Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by TXKNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by FPNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by NWA Nursing Center LLC (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by MHHNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by MHCNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by GVNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by WCNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Beebe Retirement Center Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Nashville Nursing and Rehab Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SLNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BVNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SRCNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by GNNC Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Eagle Health Systems Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by RHC Operations Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ovation Health Systems Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Reliance Health Care Inc (Henry, Judy)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as "Katherine Jones Mitchell, Mike Mims, Martha Gray Donnell, Peggy Howerton, Dale Fountain, Jessie Marie Melton, Betty Sue Bradford, Michael Askue, Barbara Ann Phillips, Kristin McCuistion, Heather Staton, Lois Henley, Tammie Jo Skaggs, Billy Ray Brewer" as marked on the document. (jak)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Steve Harrelson, Andy Wiggs, Katherine Jones Mitchell, Mike Mims, Martha Gray Donnell, Peggy Howerton, Dale Fountain, Jane Dawn Smith, Jessie Marie Melton, Betty Sue Bradford, Michael Askue, Mary Molitor, Barbara Ann Phillips, Kristin McCuistion, Heather Staton, Lois Henley, Tammie Jo Skaggs, Billy Ray Brewer.(ajt)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Katherine Jones Mitchell, Mike Mims, Martha Gray Donnell, Peggy Howerton, Dale Fountain, Jessie Marie Melton, Betty Sue Bradford, Michael Askue, Barbara Ann Phillips, Kristin McCuistion, Heather Staton, Lois Henley, Tammie Jo Skaggs, Billy Ray Brewer.(ajt) (Docket text modified on 12/19/2019 to correct the party filers) (jak)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-19-236. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT075267. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Reliance Health Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Turner
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BVNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rollins
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brandon Adams
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovation Health Systems Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Health Care Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GVNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ellis
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRCNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NWA Nursing Center LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHCNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHHNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashville Nursing and Rehab Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood Health and Rehab Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Neil
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan M Adams
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXKNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHC Operations Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Health Systems Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCNC Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beebe Retirement Center Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Marie Melton
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Molitor
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Jones Mitchell
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Askue
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Brewer
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Jo Skaggs
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Wiggs
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Howerton
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Dawn Smith
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gray Donnell
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Fountain
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Staton
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Harrelson
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Mims
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Sue Bradford
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Phillips
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Henley
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin McCuistion
Represented By: Jacques Gaston Balette
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: David T. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?