Gibbs v. Glenn et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Gibbs
Defendant: Dan, Gibson, Madison, Hatfeild, Crittden, Glenn and Cox
Case Number: 3:2020cv00347
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Gibbs re #9 Order, IFP application. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Gibbs re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Amended Complaint. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Eddie Gibbs. (llg)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eddie Gibbs. (cmn)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Gibbs re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Gibbs re #4 Notice to the Court. (fjg)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Gibbs a free-world Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and directing Gibbs, within 30 days of the date of this Order to: (a) file a notice of his current mailing address; and (b) if he has been released, file a free-world Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the $400 filing and administrative fees for this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/17/2020. (ajt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Gibbs re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (fjg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eddie Gibbs re 2 copies of #3 Order and IFP Application. (jak)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Eddie Gibbs. (llg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Gibbs. (llg)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER PRO SE PRISONERS. Denying #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff another IFP application along with two copies of this Order. Plaintiff must complete and sign the IFP application, have an authorized jail official complete and sign the certificate of prisoner accounts and calculation sheet, and return all forms to the Clerk on or before 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/30/2020. (jak)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to the Court by Eddie Gibbs. (kdr)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Eddie Gibbs. (llg)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Gibbs. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatfeild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?