Buchanan v. Melton et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Buchanan
Defendant: Corey Melton, Baker, Dexter Payne, Castello, Smith, Glass, Moses Jackson and Does 1-4, Grimes Unit, ADC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00161
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Smith served on 8/10/2022. (kth)
August 26, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Glass served on 8/10/2022. (kth)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in which to respond to the pending Recommendation is GRANTED. Any response Plaintiff wishes to file is due by 09/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/19/2022. (lmc)
August 16, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 8/15/2022 as indicated on the document. (kbc)
August 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to #9 Proposed Findings and Recommendations, by Christopher Buchanan. (ldb) Docket entry modified on 8/16/2022 to correct file date. (kbc)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending with the exception of Plaintiff's retaliation claims against Defendants Glass and Smith, Plaintiff claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted re #5 Amended Complaint. Defendants Melton, Baker, Payne, Castello, Jackson, and Does be DISMISSED as parties to this action. Objections are to be received by the Clerk of this Court within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/02/2022. (lmc)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/02/2022. (lmc)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/01/2022. (lmc)
August 2, 2022 Summons Issued as to Glass and Smith and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Glass and Smith. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the #5 Amended Complaint, Summons, and this Order on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/1/2022. (jak)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Buchanan. (llg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christopher Buchanan. (llg)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $9.00 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account to the Clerk of Court until the total balance of $350 has been paid. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Grimes Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. If Plaintiff wishes to submit an amended complaint, he shall filed the amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail plaintiff a blank 1983 complaint form. Plaintiff's #3 motion for order is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/2022. (jak)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Order by Christopher Buchanan. (ldb)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Buchanan. (ldb)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Buchanan. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Melton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4, Grimes Unit, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?