Little Rock School et al v. Pulaski Cty School et al
Plaintiff: Little Rock School District, Dale Charles, Robert L Brown, Sr, Gwen Hevey Jackson, Diane Davis and Raymond Frazier
Defendant: North Little Rock School District, Pulaski County Board of Education, Pulaski County Special School District, Arkansas, State of, Patricia Gee, George Cannon, Katherine Mitchell, W D Hamilton, Cecil Bailey, Thomas Broughton and Martin Zoldessy
Respondent: Arkansas Department of Education
Intervenor_plaintiff: North Little Rock Classroom Teachers Association, Pulaski Association of Classroom Teachers, Little Rock Classroom Teachers Association, Alexa Armstrong, Karlos Armstrong, Ed Bullington, Khayyam Davis, John Harrison, Alvin Hudson, Tatia Hudson, Milton Jackson, Lorene Joshua, Leslie Joshua, Stacy Joshua, Wayne Joshua, Katherine Knight, Sara Matthews, Derrick Miles, Janice Miles, John M Miles, NAACP, Brian Taylor, Hilton Taylor, Parsha Taylor, Robert Willingham, Tonya Willingham, Pulaski Association of Support Staff, Donna Stone and Dennis Stone
Intervenor: Blytheville School District, Bryant School District, Fort Smith School District, West Memphis School District, Altus-Denning School District, Ashdown School District, Barton-Lexa School District, Batesville School District, Biggers-Reyno School District, Black Rock School District, Bright Star School District, Brinkley School District, Centerpoint School District, Clarendon School District, Cotton Plant School District, Cutter Morning Star School District, DeWitt School District, Dollarway School District, Foreman School District, Fountain Lake School District, Gillett School District, Glen Rose School District, Guy-Perkins School District, Hoxie School District, Jonesboro School District, Kirby School District, Lavaca School District, Lewisville School District, Magazine School District, Malvern School District, Mammoth Spring School District, Manila School District, Maynard School District, Oden School District, Ozark School District, Plainview-Rover School District, Pocahontas School District, Prairie Grove School District, South Conway School District, Spring Hill School District, Stamps School District, Stephens School District, Turrell School District, Van Buren School District, Warren School District, Watson Chapel School District, West Fork School District, White Hall School District, Winslow School District, Wonderview School District, Yellville-Summit School District, Alma School District, Alread School District, Bentonville School District, Bergman School District, Berryville School District, Blevins School District, Booneville School District, Bradford School District, Buffalo Island School District, Caddo Hills School District, Charleston School District, Corning School District, County Line Public School, Crossett School District, Decatur School District, Dermott School District, Elaine School District, Fordyce School District, Gosnell School District, Greeb County Technical Schools, Green Forest School District, Greenland School District, Greenwood School District, Harrisburg School District, Hamburg School District, Holly Grove School District, Huttig School District, Jackson County School District, Junction City School District, Lakeside School District, Lead Hill School District, Leslie School District, Marion School District, Marshall School District, Mayflower School District, Mountainburg School District, Nettleton School District, Newport School District, Ola School District, Paragould School District, Parkin School District, Pleasant View School District, Quitman School District, Rural Special School District, Saratoga School District, Searcy School District, Smackover School District, Southside School District #2 Bee Branch, Strong School District, Stuttgart School District, Valley Springs School District, Waldron School District, Weiner School District, Wickes School District, Beebe School District, Carthage School District, Dumas School District, Grady School District, McGehee School District and Wynne School District
Movant: Northeast Arkansas School District
Claimant: Office of Desegregation Monitoring
Amicus: Reedie Ray, Mark Perry and Ben E Rice
Case Number: 4:1982cv00866
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5730 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 5610 Motion to allocate the burden of proof, denying as moot 5724 Motion to strike, and granting 5686 JNPSD's motion for unitary status. With the exception of completing its 2018 master facilities plan as modified, JNPSD is unitary. 5621 Motion for unitary status by PCSSD partly granted and partly denied. With the exception of truing-up the Mills High School/Robinson Middle School problem, PCSSD is unitary. Intervenors must provide their support ing records to the other parties by 6/18/2021. Motion for fees (either unopposed or opposed) due by 7/30/2021. With the exception of the noted facilities issues, and the fee issues, which are collateral, this Court's jurisdiction over the Pulaski County Special School District and the Jacksonville/North Pulaski School District is at an end. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/6/2021. (jak)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5728 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for September and October 2020, 5722 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November 2020 through March 2021. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. Doc. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/2021. (jak)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5722 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for June and July 2020, 5689 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for September and October 2020. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Doc. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2020. (jak)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5704 ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Greg Hodges to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Courthouse in Little Rock for the bench trial beginning 10/5/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/5/2020. (jak)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5703 ORDER partly granting, partly denying, and partly denying without prejudice 5688 Motion in Limine for the reasons stated on the record at the 9/24/2020 pretrial conference. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/24/2020. (jak)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5698 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) and laptop computers into the courthouse for the 9/24/2020 pretrial and for the bench trial beginning 10/5/2020. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/22/2020. (jak)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5652 ORDER denying 5600 Motion to intervene. Dr. Warren's request to participate in the trial is not timely. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2020. (jak)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5625 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for January, 2020, Doc 5564 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for February, March, and April 2020. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2020. (jak)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5598 ORDER modifying the schedule for the upcoming trial. The trial on PCSSD issues will begin 7/14/2020, as previously planned, and wrap up by the end of the month. And the trial on JNPSD issues will be held from 10/5/2020 through 10/6/2020. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. The 5577 Intervenors' motion in limine is denied. The Court requests the parties to confer and submit a proposal on the school tours by 5/29/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2020. (jak)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5596 ORDER allowing Margie Powell and counsel for the parties to bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the 5/6/2020 hearing. Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. The use of any tape recording, however, shall be limited by and subject to Local Rule 83.2(d). The simulcast for media and observers will be available in Courtroom #2B. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/2020. (jak)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5585 ORDER postponing the status conference set for 4/15/2020. The status conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/2020. (jak)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5574 ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter. On 2/15/1983, M. Samuel Jones III appeared as counsel in this case for the Pulaski County Special School District. He has well and faithfully represented PCSSD as lead counsel in the decades since. The Court understands and appreciates his new role. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2020. (jak)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5564 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for December 2019, 5555 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for January 2020. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2020. (jak)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5561 ORDER: The Court is attaching Ms. Powell's Eighth summary report, which covers monitoring matters at JNPSD, No. 5502 at 2-3. The Court appreciates her work on all the summary reports. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2020. (jak)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5559 ORDER: The Court is attaching Ms. Powell's seventh summary report, which covers monitoring matters at PCSSD. No. 5502 at 2-3. The Court appreciates her work. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2020. (jak)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5555 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for November 2019, 5551 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for December 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/2020. (jak)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5553 ORDER: The Court recently received the attached email and letters. Also attached are my responses. If any party believes the Court should take any further step, please file a notice by 12/31/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Document)(jak)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5551 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for October 2019, No. 5541 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/9/2019. (jak)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5544 ORDER continuing the status conference scheduled for December 11th to 4/15/2020 at 2:00 p.m. In the meantime, the parties should push forward with discovery. The Court would appreciate receiving a joint status report with a summary of the parties� 39; plan for written discovery and depositions. Please cover this ground in the 12/6/2019 report. The Court amends No. 5503 : If needed, the last week of trial will be 8/10/2020 to 8/14/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/2019. (jak)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5541 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for September 2019, 5527 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for October 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days, No. 5034 .. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/21/2019. (jak)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5540 ORDER: The Court is attaching Ms. Powell's fourth summary report, which covers achievement-related matters at JNPSD. No. 5502 at 2-3. The Court appreciates her work. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/19/2019. (jak)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5538 ORDER: The Court is attached Ms. Powell's third summary report, which covers discipline-related matters at JNPSD. No. 5502 The Court appreciates her work. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2019. (jak)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5536 ORDER: Pursuant to 5503 scheduling order, the Court converts 5534 Motion to a notice about unitary status. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket accordingly. Intervenors' responses to the Districts' notices are due by 11/22/2019, No. 5526 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/29/2019. (jak)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5531 ORDER: The Court is attaching Ms. Powell's second summary report, which covers discipline-related matters at PCSSD. No. 5502 at 2-3. The Court appreciates her work. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5519 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for the second quarter of 2019, No. 5506 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for July and August 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2019. (jak)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5508 ORDER: Ms. Powell is willing to continue serving as the Court's expert, and no party has objected, No. 5504 & 5505 . The Court therefore extends her appointment until 2/1/2021 on the existing terms. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/30/2019. (jak)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5507 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 5461 Motion for attorney's fees and expenses. JNPSD owes Intervenors' counsel $143,213.80. The Court directs the Clerk to add Linda Morgan to the docket as an intervenor plaintiff. Any objection to the facilities report due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/2019. (jak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5506 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for February and March 2019, 5496 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for the second quarter of 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. No. 5034 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2019. (jak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5504 ORDER: Margie Powell's appointment as the Court's expert is set to expire on 8/1/2019, No. 5413 . The Court intends to extend her appointment 18 months - From 8/1/2019 until; 2/1/2021 - on the existing terms, unless she declines to serve or a party objects. The Court requests Ms. Powell to file a paper with the Clerk by 7/26/2019 indicating her preference. Any objection is due by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2019. (jak)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5496 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for November and December 2018 and January 2019, No. 5494 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for February and March 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/8/2019. (jak)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5494 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for October 2018, No. 5459 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November and December 2018 and January 2019. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2019. (jak)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5459 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice 5446 for September, and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for October 2018. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/31/2018. (jak)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5454 ORDER: The Court appreciates the counsel's letter about the construction at Sylvan Hills High School, No. 5452 . In the circumstances, it's better to avoid taking the group through an active construction site. Observation from the perimete r and photos might also be helpful. And if informative drawings or other plans are available, the Court would appreciate PCSSD providing them to opposing counsel and the Court before the tour. They should be filed under seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2018. (jak)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5453 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' 5451 joint report and adopts the proposed deadlines. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2018. (jak)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5445 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 5238 Motion. JNPSD is unitary, and is released from Court supervision on all of Plan 2000 § L's staffing obligations, except on § L(3) incentives. JNPSD will be unitary on Plan 2000 § ; H's facilities obligations if it implements its 2018 master facilities plan as modified by this Order. JNPSD is released from supervision on facilities except for its obligation to file a progress report by 7/1/2019, and each year thereafter, until it completes its facilities plan. The Court retains jurisdiction, of course, to ensure that the District follows through. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2018. (jak)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5441 ORDER: The Court regrets its delay in ruling after the February trial on facilities and staffing issues at JNPSD. The Court will finish and file its decision based on the existing record. 5431 , 5437 , and 5438 Motions are denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/21/2018. (jak)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5430 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones, (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the 9/24/2018 hearing. Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2018. (jak)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5427 ORDER: The Court repeats its thanks to PCSSD for arranging the school tours on 8/9/2018, Round two of the tours scheduled for 11/1/2018. PCSSD must confer with the Intervenors and propose a schedule for the other four schools by 9/28/2018. The Court will hold a hearing on 9/24/2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1A in Little Rock instead of doing the second round of tours that day. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2018. (jak)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5425 ORDER: The photographer request by the Arkansas Democrat Gazette is the newspaper's call. The intervenors have asked by letter that two students who participate in the Donaldson Scholars program visit with the group and see the facilities. The Court is concerned that we're at, or past, a manageable number for the tour. The Court is confident that PCSSD can arrange a separate tour for Donaldson Scholars at some other time. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/7/2018. (jak)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5423 ORDER: The parties have informally advised the Court that the visits to Sylvan Hills High School, Fuller Middle School, College Station Elementary, and Harris Elementary can take place on 9/24/2018. The Court would appreciate a joint proposal from PCSSD and Joshua on the schedule by 8/24/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2018. (jak)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5421 ORDER: The Court regrets that it cannot do the second tour on the date of 9/10/2018. Doing the tour when students are present is fine with the Court. Would 9/24/2018 be convenient for PCSSD and counsel? Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2018. (jak)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5416 ORDER: The Court appreciates PCSSD's thoughtfulness on the tour logistics. Court personnel will travel in a separate vehicle and pay for their own lunch. The Court requests that PCSSD advise chambers about the rendezvous location, and the cost per box lunch, sometime this week. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/30/2018. (jak)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5413 ORDER: The Court intends to extend Margie Powell's appointment by one year, from 8/1/2018 to 9/1/2019 on the existing terms. The Court requests Ms. Powell to file a paper with the Clerk by 7/28/2018 indicating her preference. Any objection is due by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2018. (jak)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5412 ORDER: The Court confirms Tiffany Ellis as a representative of the new sub-class of intervenors. 5393 objection is overruled on Tiffany Ellis and overruled without prejudice as premature on Takeena Wilbon. JNPSD must depose Wilbon by 9/17/2018. Renewed motion, or an agreed motion demonstrating that she is qualified to serve, due by 10/17/2018. Nominees for new representatives for the PCSSD group due by 9/17/2018, too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/17/2018. (jak)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5401 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's 5395 invoice for April 2018 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bills for May 2018. he Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/31/2018. (jak)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5395 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's 5391 invoice for March 2018 and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for April 2018. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/2018. (jak)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5390 ORDER granting 5389 Motion. Tiffany Ellis is substituted for Eshe Mustafa as a tentative representative for the new subclass of intervenors. Takeena Wilbon remains as the other tentative representative. The Court appreciates the update on the continuing discovery about their service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2018. (jak)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5382 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for November and December 2017, No. 5348 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for January and February 2018. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/5/2018. (jak)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5369 ORDER mostly granting and partly denying 5355 Motion. Embedded 5360 Motion partly granting as modified and partly denying without prejudice. Eshe Mustafa and Takeena Wilbon added (tentatively) as representatives of the JNPSD students/parents sub- class. Request to consider supplemental authority, 5364 , granted. JNPSD has until 3/9/2018 to explore Mustafa's and Wilbon's adequacy as sub-class representatives. They may not testify at next week's trial and any motion to remove Mustafa or Wilbon is due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/2/2018. (jak)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5366 ORDER allowing Margie Powell and counsel for the parties to bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the hearing scheduled the week of 2/5/2018. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2018. (jak)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5363 ORDER: The Court received the attached email from PCSSD's lawyer. And the Court appreciates the notice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2018. (jak)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5361 ORDER: JNPSD's 5358 objections are sustained. Joshua must provide an updated list of specific documents no later than noon on 1/29/2018. Both parties must exchange copies of all exhibits on 1/31/2018 as planned. The Court would appreciate JNPSD's expedited reply on the evidentiary issues by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/25/2018. (jak)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5348 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for October 2017, 5342 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November and December 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after 7 calendar days. No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/2/2018. (jak)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5345 ORDER: The Court intends to extend Margie Powell's appointment by one year - from 8/1/2017 until 8/1/2018 - on the existing terms, unless she declines to serve or a party objects. The Court requests Ms. Powell to file a paper with the Clerk by 12/15/2017 indicating her preference. Any objection is due by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/1/2017. (jak)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5333 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoice for August 2017, No. 5323 and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bills for September 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2017. (jak)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5327 ORDER: The Court held a status conference on 9/8/2017 and set the following deadlines: PCSSD's facilities report due 10/9/2017; Joshua's facilities report due 10/24/2017; and Powell's expert facilities report due 11/8/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2017. (jak)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5324 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the 9/8/2017 hearing. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. The use of any such recording, however, shall be limited by and subject to Local Rule 83.2(d). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2017. (jak)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5316 ORDER: Having received no objections, the Court approves Ms. Powell's invoice for June 2017, No. 5311 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for July 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/2017. (jak)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5308 ORDER: Having received no objections, the Court approves Ms. Powell's invoice for April 2017, 5304 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for May 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/2017. (jak)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5303 ORDER: Report of settlement conference, 5301 noted. The Court appreciates Judge Kearney's efforts and is heartened to hear that progress was made. The 5299 Scheduling Order remains in effect. These deadlines will not be extended. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/25/2017. (jak)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5294 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the March 14 hearing. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/2017. (jak)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5291 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's invoices for December 2016 and January 2017, 5290 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for February 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2017. (jak)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5290 ORDER: Having received no objections, the Court approves Ms. Powell's invoice for November, 5287 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for December 2016 and January 2017. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2017. (jak)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5287 ORDER: Having received no objections, the Court approves Ms. Powell's invoice for September and October, 5273 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November 2016. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/12/2016. (jak)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5284 ORDER: The Court appreciates the Districts' status reports and Joshua's responding papers. Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse for the 12/7/2016 hearing. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5272 ORDER granting 5243 Motion. The State owes JNPSD $13,224 - $13,110 in fees and $114 in undisputed costs. Joshua's 5247 Motion, granted in part and denied in part. The State owes Joshua $6,025. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/2016. (jak)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5268 ORDER: From now on, Ms. Powell will bill district-specific tasks to PCSSD and JNPSD separately. Broader tasks that aren't specific to one district or the other, will be billed half to each district. The objection period and other terms of Ms. Powell's appointment, 5034 , remain unchanged. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/21/2016. (jak)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5260 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones-including smart phones- into the courthouse for the 9/15/2016 hearing. Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2016. (jak)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5256 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' status reports, 5251 & 5253 . And the Court looks forward to a further update at the September 15th conference on the detachment, the start of the school year, staffing, facilities, and the method for paying Ms. Powell. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2016. (jak)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5255 ORDER: The Court attaches Ms. Powell's revised invoices for August. In light of Ms. Powell's correspondence, the Court needs an update on how the Districts intend to compensate her. This will be covered at the upcoming status conference. The Court will revise the terms of Ms. Powell's appointment thereafter as needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2016. (jak)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5239 ORDER denying 5234 Motion to Intervene and granting 5223 Motion to Enforce. (The Court clarifies that it benefitted from the Dulaneys' arguments and recognizes the family as amici curiae on the motion to enforce). The parties' 2014 set tlement agreement, as embodied in this Court's Consent Judgment 5063 obligates the State Board of Education to honor exemptions from the School Choice Act claimed by the Pulaski County Special School District and the Jacksonville/North Pulaski School District through the 2018-2019 school year. The State Board's 7/15/2016 decision granting the Dulaneys' school choice appeal, 5223 -5, is set aside. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/9/2016. (jak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5225 ORDER: Motion to enforce, 5223 , noted. Because school starts in two weeks, the request for expedited consideration is granted. Responses due by 8/4/2016. Hearing set for 1:00 p.m. on Monday, 8/8/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2016. (jak)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5212 ORDER: The Court approves Ms. Powell's bill for March, 5209 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for April 2016. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2016. (jak)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5210 ORDER: No one has objected to the Jacksonville/North Pulaski School District being joined as a party; and the time to do so has passed, 5208 . For the reasons stated on the record at the 16 March 2016 status conference, the Court therefore directs the Clerk to add JNPSD as a defendant in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2016. (jak)
April 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5209 ORDER: The Court approves Ms. Powell's bill for February, 5194 , and authorizes payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for March 2016. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2016. (jak)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5208 ORDER: The next status conference in this case will be 22 June 2016 at 1:30 p.m., as scheduled. The Court modified its earlier Order, 5205 , about the process for bringing Plan 2000 compliance issues to the Court's attention. If the parties rea ch an impasse, they don't have to submit the issue to the Department of Justice. They should, however, follow the rest of N(2)'s procedure, and so certify, before bringing a matter to the Court. The deadline for filing any objection to the Jacksonville/North Pulaski School District being formally joined as a party is 28 March 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2016. (jak)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5205 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' status reports and responding papers. The agenda for the 16 March 2016 status conference will include staffing, facilities, monitoring, architecture, and JNPSD - party status. The Court would prefer to h ave a separate evidentiary hearing, if need be, after these points are ventilated at the upcoming conference. Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the Courthouse for the March 16 hearing. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2016. (jak)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5194 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's bill for January, 5192 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for February 2016. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/29/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5192 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's bill for December, 5182 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for January 2016. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, No. 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2016. (jak)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5188 ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter from Gina Jones. The Court understands these parents' concerns. But it is not this Court's role to superintend all the details of JNPSD's detachment from PCSSD. Ms. Jones and other parents must work with the PCSSD, JNPSD, and the Department of Education to sort out their children's future participation in the Scholars Program. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/2016. (jak)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5187 ORDER: The Court holds that JNPSD's proposed master facilities plan, though incomplete, keeps faith with Plan 2000 and is likely to promote, not hinder, eliminating the vestiges of past discrimination insofar as practicable. The proposed master plan is approved with an important condition: it must be supplemented by 31 December 2016 with when-and-how specifics about replacing the four other elementary schools, so that all the new district's elementary schools are equal. Joshua's o bjections are overruled; and its request for an evidentiary hearing is denied. The parties should use January 19 for their monthly meeting. They should continue collaborating then about whatever facilities and staffing issues they believe need attention. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/14/2016. (jak)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5185 ORDER: The Court appreciates and attaches a correction to Ms. Powell's report on JNPSD's proposed Facilities Master Plan, 5179 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2016. (jak)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5182 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's bill for November, 5168 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for December 2015. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2016. (jak)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5179 ORDER: The Court appreciates and attaches Ms. Powell's report on JNPSD's proposed Facilities Master Plan and whether it's consistent with Plan 2000. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/29/2015. (jak)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5178 ORDER: For the reasons stated at the 16 December 2015 hearing, the Court directs JNPSD, the Joshua Intervenors, and Dr. Charles Stein to meet on facilities issues no later than 31 December 2015. By 5 January 2016, Joshua must file a paper with specif ic, fact-based arguments on why JNPSD's proposed Facilities Master Plan shouldn't receive the Court's approval as consistent with Plan 2000. JNPSD's response is due by 8 January 2016. Ms. Powell will file a short report on the iss ue by 10 January 2016 and if an evidentiary hearing is needed, the Court will hold one at 1:30 p.m. on 19 January 2016. The Court will hold status conferences on 24 March 2016, 22 June 2016, 15 September 2016, and 7 December 2016. The Court directs P CSSD, Joshua, and JNPSD to continue meeting monthly on facilities, personnel and any other issues that arise. The parties' exhibits are admitted. The Court has considered, them, and will consider them, in addressing the proposed Master Plan. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2015. (jak)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5176 ORDER: Margie Powell and counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones - including smart phones - into the Courthouse for the December 16 hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/2015. (jak)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5174 ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates the parties' status reports. The Court is studying them. The 16 December 2015 status conference will start at 1:30 p.m. We'll first spend about thirty minutes on the Donaldson Scholars Academy. After a short break, we'll return to facilities at 2:15 p.m. Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder to the December 16 status conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2015. (jak)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5168 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's bill for October, 5167 , and authorizing payment. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for November 2015. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2015. (jak)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5167 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's bill for September, 5163 , and authorizing payment. The Court notes and appreciates the discount Ms. Powell applied to that bill. The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for October 2015. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5166 STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER. The following schedule applies to all future status conferences. Fourteen calendar days before the hearing - reports and briefs filed. Seven calendar days before the hearing - proposed exhibits filed. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no document that does not comply with these deadlines will be considered at a status conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2015. (jak)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5160 ORDER: The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for August 2015. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days, 5034 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (jak)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5154 ORDER: For the reasons stated at the 20 August 2015 hearing, the Court confirms its ruling about Dr. Guess's current role on desegregation-related issues, including staffing. The Court directs PCSSD, Joshua, and JNPSD to meet monthly on faciliti es-related issues between now and the December status conference. PCSSD will host the September meeting, Joshua will host the October meeting; and JNPSD will host the November meeting. The 16 December 2015 status conference will focus on facilities. The Court will also get an update on the Donaldson Scholars program. Joshua's response brief on the proposed PCSSD /JNPSD detachment agreement is due by 31 August 2015. Replies from PCSSD and JNPSD due by 4 September 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/2015. (jak)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5151 ORDER: Having received no objections, the Court approves Ms. Powell's bills for June and July, 5122 & 5143 , and authorizes payment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5150 ORDER: Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder to the hearing on 20 August 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5143 ORDER: The Court attaches Ms. Powell's bill for July 2015. The Court will authorize payment if there are no objections after seven calendar days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/2015. (jak)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5135 ORDER: The Court made a calendar mistake in Margie Powell's appointment Order, 5132 . Ms. Powell's appointment is extended until next year: 31 July 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/21/2015. (jak)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5127 ORDER granting 5125 MOTION for Hearing. The Court will hold a status conference on 20 July 2015 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1A. Responses to the substance of Joshua's motion are due by 15 July 2015. Counsel for the Jacksonville/North Pulaski District may file a response and participate in the status conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2015. (jak)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5123 ORDER requesting Ms. Powell to file a paper with the Clerk by 10 July 2015 indicating whether she will serve for another year as the Court's appointed expert. Any objection due by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2015. (jak)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5071 ORDER authorizing payment for Ms. Powell's August Bill re 5064 . Ms. Powell's bill for work in September is attached. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2014. (jak)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5064 ORDER approving Ms. Powell's July bill, 5054 , and authorizing payment. Ms. Powell's bill for work in August is attached. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2014. (jak) (Docket text modified on 8/29/2014 to correct the ruling.) (thd).
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5022 ORDER allowing any member of the media to bring an audio recording device into the courthouse for the hearing on 11 June 2014. The use of these devices is subject to the restrictions in Local Rules 83.2(d). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/2014. (jak)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4971 ORDER informing anyone who made a filing may speak at the fairness hearing if they so desire at 9:30 a.m. on 13 January 2014. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to everyone who filed a paper response to the notice of proposed settlement. Any proposed hearing exhibits are due in chambers by noon on 10 January 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/3/2014. (jak)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4931 ORDER granting 4930 MOTION for Hearing on Case Status filed by Arkansas Department of Education: Status Conference set for 11/20/2013 at 1:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2013. (mkf)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4839 ORDER re 4826 Notice (Other) filed by Pulaski County Special School District, 4821 Response (Non Motion) filed by Arkansas Department of Education, Arkansas, State of, 4810 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Order regarding timetables for handling PCSSD unitary-status issues and the motion for release. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/5/13. (kpr)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4810 ORDER denying 4743 Motion to Dismiss. The LRSD should respond to the motion for release by 2/1/13. The 4767 Motion for Scheduling Order is granted. Joint report due by 2/22/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/13. (kpr)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4781 ORDER re: Request by the Magnet Review Committee to approve the interdistrict magnet schools' final 2011-12 budget and proposed 2012-13 budget (attached). Any objections should be filed by 10/29/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/12. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 10/17/2012 to correct the linkage and the description of the document filed.) (thd).
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4770 ORDER granting 4762 Motion for Discovery; granting 4766 Motion to Extend Time and approving ODM's proposed budget. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/12. (kpr)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4726 ORDER allowing Cynthia Howell to bring an audio recording device into the courthouse for the hearing on March 29, 202, subject to the restrictions in Local Rule 83.2(d). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/12. (kpr)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4717 ORDER directing the State and the Charter Schools to file a substituted 4713 Statement of Facts 4710 Statement of Facts by March 23, 2012, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/12. (kpr)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4690 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4620 Motion to Intervene and directing the charter schools to file their proposed complaint in intervention by January 15, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/29/11. (kpr)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4685 ORDER approving the interdistrict magnet schools' final 2010-11 budget and proposed 2011-12 budget 4655 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4655 ORDER re the Magnet Review Committee's interdistrict magnet schools final 2010-11 budget and proposed 2011-12 budget, attached to this Order. Any party having an objection should file it by November 18, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/11. (Attachments: # 1 Document, # 2 Document)(kpr)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4623 ORDER denying 4591 Motion for Ruling; denying 4593 Motion for Ruling for want of jurisdiction; and denying 4595 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/11. (kpr)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4608 ORDER denying in part 4440 Motion to Enforce; denying 4481 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice; granting in part and denying in part 4491 Motion to Quash; denying 4503 Motion to Approve/Approval; granting 4546 Motion for Order; denying 4560 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief. The State funding for Majority-to-Minority transfers will continue pending appeal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/11. (kpr)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4587 ORDER directing the parties to file any objections to the attached budget for 2011-2012 by July 21, 2011. The ODM is directed to file a report by September 16, 2011, as outlined in this Order, and to file its report with the Clerk. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/11. (kpr)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4585 ORDER regarding recusal. The Court concludes that the circumstances present no basis requiring or counseling disqualification under 28 U.S.C. §455(a) or (b). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/11. (kpr)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4507 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW granting in part and denying in part 4141 Petition for a Declaration of Unitary Status and Release from Court Supervision filed by North Little Rock School District and granting in part and denying in part [4 159] Petition for a Declaration of Unitary Status and Release from Court Supervision filed by Pulaski County Special School District ; releasing the State of Arkansas from its obligation to pay for any and all desegregation efforts of the North Littl e Rock School District, the Pulaski County Special School District, and the Little Rock School District, except for those associated with M-to-M transfers. Each district has 30 days from the entry of this order to file a ten-page brief to show cause why the State of Arkansas should not be ordered to stop funding for M-to-M transfers. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/19/11. (kpr)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4451 ORDER denying 4449 Motion to Intervene; denying 4450 Motion for TRO; denying 4450 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/10. (bkp)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4422 ORDER that North Little Rock School District's petition for declaration of unitary status and release from court supervision are due on or before June 7, 2010; proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on Pulaski County Special School District's motion for a declaration of unitary status are due on or before June 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/7/10. (bkp)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4420 ORDER denying 4376 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/10. (bkp)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4378 ORDER denying 4372 Motion in Limine filed by Joshua Intervenors. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/10. (bkp)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4369 AMENDED ORDER 4367 authorizing electronic devices into the Courthouse between Monday, March 1, 2010 and Friday, March 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/24/10. (bkp)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4355 ORDER authorizing the attorneys named in this Order to bring certain electronics into the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthouse between Tuesday, February 16, 2010 and Friday, February 19, 2010, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/10. (bkp)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4347 ORDER authorizing those mentioned in this Order to bring certain electronics into the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse between Monday, February 8, 2010 and Friday, February 12, 2010, subject to the rules outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/5/10. (bkp)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4341 ORDER authorizing counsel to bring certain electronics into the courthouse between Tuesday, February 2, 2010 and Friday, February 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/1/10. (bkp)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4329 ORDER authorizing parties to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse between Monday, January 25, 2010 and Friday, January 29, 2010, subject to the rules outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/21/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4327 ORDER denying 4309 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/10. (bkp)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4312 ORDER regarding hearings schedules. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/11/10. (bkp)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4278 ORDER appointing Margie Powell as Monitor and setting her annual salary at $100,000, to be paid by the parties through the annual budget of the Office of Desegregation Monitoring. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/4/09. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4267 ORDER authorizing those persons set forth in the Order to bring certain electronic devices into the Courthouse on September 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/29/09. (bkp)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4252 ORDER with proposed 2009-2010 budget for the Office of Desegregation Monitoring attached, which budget will be accepted as presented and will become effective within five days, unless the parties file objections within that time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/24/09. (bkp)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4245 ORDER authorizing counsel to bring electronic equipment into the Courthouse between Monday, April 13, 2009 and Tuesday, April 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/10/09. (bkp)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4243 ORDER setting a status hearing for Monday, April 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/7/09. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock School et al v. Pulaski Cty School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock School District
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Charles
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Brown, Sr
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Hevey Jackson
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Davis
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Frazier
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock School District
Represented By: Stephen W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Board of Education
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Special School District
Represented By: M. Samuel Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gee
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Cannon
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Mitchell
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W D Hamilton
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Bailey
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Broughton
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Zoldessy
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: North Little Rock Classroom Teachers Association
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Pulaski Association of Classroom Teachers
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Little Rock Classroom Teachers Association
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Alexa Armstrong
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Karlos Armstrong
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ed Bullington
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Khayyam Davis
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John Harrison
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Alvin Hudson
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tatia Hudson
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Milton Jackson
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Lorene Joshua
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Leslie Joshua
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Stacy Joshua
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Wayne Joshua
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Katherine Knight
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Sara Matthews
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Derrick Miles
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Janice Miles
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John M Miles
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: NAACP
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Brian Taylor
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Hilton Taylor
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Parsha Taylor
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Willingham
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tonya Willingham
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Pulaski Association of Support Staff
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Donna Stone
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Dennis Stone
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Blytheville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bryant School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fort Smith School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West Memphis School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Altus-Denning School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ashdown School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Barton-Lexa School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Batesville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Biggers-Reyno School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Black Rock School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bright Star School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Brinkley School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Centerpoint School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Clarendon School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cotton Plant School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cutter Morning Star School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DeWitt School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dollarway School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Foreman School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fountain Lake School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gillett School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Glen Rose School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Guy-Perkins School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hoxie School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jonesboro School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kirby School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lavaca School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lewisville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Magazine School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Malvern School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mammoth Spring School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Manila School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Maynard School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Oden School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ozark School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Plainview-Rover School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pocahontas School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Prairie Grove School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: South Conway School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Spring Hill School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stamps School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stephens School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Turrell School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Van Buren School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Warren School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Watson Chapel School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West Fork School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: White Hall School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Winslow School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wonderview School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Yellville-Summit School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alma School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alread School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bentonville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bergman School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Berryville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Blevins School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Booneville School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bradford School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Buffalo Island School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Caddo Hills School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Charleston School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Corning School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County Line Public School
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Crossett School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Decatur School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dermott School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Elaine School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fordyce School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gosnell School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Greeb County Technical Schools
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Green Forest School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Greenland School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Greenwood School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Harrisburg School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hamburg School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Holly Grove School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Huttig School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jackson County School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Junction City School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lakeside School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lead Hill School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Leslie School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Marion School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Marshall School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mayflower School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mountainburg School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nettleton School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Newport School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ola School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Paragould School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Parkin School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pleasant View School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Quitman School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rural Special School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Saratoga School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Searcy School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Smackover School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southside School District #2 Bee Branch
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Strong School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stuttgart School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Springs School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Waldron School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Weiner School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wickes School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Beebe School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carthage School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dumas School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Grady School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: McGehee School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wynne School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Northeast Arkansas School District
Represented By: James M. Llewellyn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arkansas Department of Education
Represented By: Jeremy Christopher Lasiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Office of Desegregation Monitoring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Reedie Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mark Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ben E Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?