Kelly v. Conway Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Freddie J Kelly
Defendant: Conway Arkansas, City of, Conway Police Department, Conway Fire Department and Smith
Case Number: 4:2008cv02144
Filed: September 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Conway Arkansas, City of, Smith, John Does against Freddie J Kelly re 70 Order dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/10. (bkp)
January 14, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER cancelling the trial set for February 9, 2010, as the case will be dismissed by separate order and judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/14/10. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/30/09. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 37 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/22/09. (bkp)
October 27, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing parties Conway Police Department and Conway Fire Department as parties to this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/27/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Conway Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie J Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?