Bryant v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Cameron Bryant
Defendant: Paul W Jackson, Lorie A Taylor, Gary Bruton and Kay Howell
Case Number: 4:2009cv00719
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 52 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/10. (vjt)
October 20, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kay Howell, Lorie A Taylor be granted and the case be dismissed without prejudice and that the 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cameron Bryant be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due within 14 days of entry of these recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/20/10. (bkp)
September 23, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to defts' 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment within ten days of the date of t his Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/10. (bkp)
May 3, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion Dismiss Case as Frivolous. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/3/10. (bkp)
January 22, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to prepare summons for the defendants and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/22/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?