Porter v. Lumpkin et al

Plaintiff: Darnell Porter
Defendant: Lumpkin, Stewart and Faulkner County, Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2009cv00890
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 65 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/21/11. (bkp)
January 7, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lumpkin, Garry Stewart and directing plaintiff to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)
October 1, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/10. (vjt)
September 23, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 49 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/10. (bkp)
March 9, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defendant Faulkner County for plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/9/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft. Dr. Garry Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darnell Porter and assessing an initial partial filing fee of $8.53 with the balance of the statutory filing fee of $341.47 to be paid through collections from the pl aintiff's prison trust account; service is appropriate for the defts Nurse Lumpkin and Dr. Stewart and the Clerk is ordered to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and complaint on defts without prepayment of fees therefor; and further directing the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Faulkner County Detention Facility, 801 Locust Street, Conway, AR 72032. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?