Burgie v. Hannah et al

Plaintiff: Eric C Burgie
Defendant: Jim R Hannah, Donald L Corbin, Annabelle Clinton Imber, Paul E Danielson, Jim Gunter, Robert L Brown and Elana Willis
Case Number: 4:2009cv00920
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and Order 52 Motion for Extension of Time is Denied as Moot; [54 56 Motions to Compel are Denied; 43 Motion For Summary Judgment by Defendant Newbery is Granted; 64 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis is held in abeyance. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/12/10. (dac)
July 12, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Clarify and advising plaintiff that he must file any opposition he has to the summary judgment motion by July 23, 2010. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/12/10. (bkp)
June 14, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 35 Motion to Amend and 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/14/10. (vjt)
April 13, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Eric C Burgie. This is actually a request for discovery and should be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/13/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgie v. Hannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C Burgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim R Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annabelle Clinton Imber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elana Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?