Salinas et al v. Global Geophysical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Reyes Salinas and Magdalena Salinas
Defendant: Global Geophysical Services Inc and Seeco Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00316
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss on the condition that Plaintiffs reimburse Global for duplicative costs, expenses, and attorney's fees occasioned by any refiling of this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
November 29, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying at this time Global's 13 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/29/10. (vjt)
September 20, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 12/8/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/20/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas et al v. Global Geophysical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Salinas
Represented By: Keith L. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Salinas
Represented By: Keith L. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Geophysical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?