McCall v. Richards et al

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Richards, Lester, Reed, Griffin and Parker
Case Number: 4:2010cv02069
Filed: December 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Dispositive motions may be filed on or before 12/16/2011. Absent the filing of dispositive motions, the Court will appoint counsel for Mr. McCall and notify Judge Billy Roy Wilson that a jury trial setting is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/16/2011. (kdr)
July 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION and granting the 52 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/7/11. (kpr)
May 31, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 41 granting 34 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Jamie Shawn McCall. Following a hearing before Magistrate Beth Deere to determine the amount of damages, default judgment will be entered against defts Richards, Reed, Parker, Lester and Griffin. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/31/11. (kpr)
March 15, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Marvel without prejudice; dismissing claims, as set forth in this Order, against defts without prejudice; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Richards, Parker, Reed, Griffin, and Lester in their official capacities without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/15/11. (kpr)
February 25, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 21 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/25/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Richards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?