Clark v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Christopher S Clark
Defendant: Bingham, Heather Zomant, Clark, Harris, Brian Duke, Ellis and Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv00135
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 119 Memorandum and Order dismissing complaint with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/11/12. (kpr)
September 7, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of plaintiff, together with his medical and institutional files, at the 11/28/12 evidentiary hearing. The parties shall submit their witness and exhibit lists no later than 10/26/12. The Clerk is dir ected to send a copy of this Order to the Arkansas Dept. of Correction Central Transportation/Medical Services, 6814 Princeton Pike, Pine Bluff, Ar 71602. The Clerk shall also forward to plaintiff a witness/exhibit list form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/7/12. (kpr)
August 20, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 102 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defts Clark and Harris are dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/20/12. (kpr)
April 26, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Motion to Strike Discovery ; granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive motions shall be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/26/12. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Magistrate Judge Jerome Thomas Kearney's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Defendant Brian Duke from this action; and dismissing Plaintiff's allegations against White County inmates. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/4/11. (hph)
September 26, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Christopher S Clark. The Clerk shall prepare summons for deft Clark, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/26/11. (kpr)
August 23, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the defts Bingham and Clark, and the U.S. is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on defts without prepayment of costs therefor. The Plaintiff is ordered to notify the Court of the correct identity and last-known address of deft Harris within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/23/11. (kpr)
August 3, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file with the Court, under seal, the last-known addresses of defts Bingham, Clark and Harris within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/3/11. (kpr)
July 19, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside 21 23 24 Summons Returned Executed on defts Bingham, Clark and Harris; and granting 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/19/11. (kpr)
May 26, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the amended complaint and summons on defts Ellis, Bingham, Zomant, Clark and Harris. Pltf is directed to determine the complete identity of defts Misty and Chris and to provide the Court full names and addresses so that summons may be served upon them. The pltf's 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/26/11. (kpr)
April 18, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 6 Memorandum and Order dismissing case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/18/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Zomant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?