Moore v. Arkansas Department of Health et al

Plaintiff: Angela Moore
Defendant: Bob Higginbottom and Arkansas Department of Health
Case Number: 4:2011cv00174
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 56 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing the complaint of Angela Moore with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/12. (vjt)
March 15, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to respond to defts' 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment on or before 3/30/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 30 Motion to Extend Deadlines; Dispositive Motions and Status Report due by 1/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 MOTION of M. Stephen Bingham to Withdraw as Appointed Counsel for Angela Moore; appointing Eugene G. Sayre to represent pltf in all further proceedings; the Clerk is directed to send pltf and counsel a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/11. (vjt)
April 25, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Arkansas Department of Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Higginbottom
Represented By: Reginald Adolph Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Health
Represented By: Reginald Adolph Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?