Escobar v. Cross et al

Plaintiff: Luis Estuardo Escobar
Defendant: J Cross, Smiley, Foot and Lipscomb
Case Number: 4:2012cv00023
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 20 Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/27/2013. (srw)
July 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations; dismissing pltf's claims for monetary damages from defts in their official capacities; and dismissing deft Capt. Foot as a deft in this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/9/12. (kpr)
June 12, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for Defendants J. Cross, Smiley, and Lipscomb; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 2 Plaintiff's Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/12/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Estuardo Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?