LaMere v. Pennington et al

Plaintiff: Fred Michael LaMere
Defendant: Serena Brawley, Does, Richards, McKinney, Lester, Shelnut, Bruce Pennington and Birdsong
Case Number: 4:2012cv00048
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the parties' stipulation for dismissal 134 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/19/13. (kpr)
September 11, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for the week of September 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/11/13. (kpr)
April 29, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 73 Answers to Amended Complaint. The defendants set forth in this Order have supplied their correct names. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of these defts.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
November 28, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing attorney Thomas William Burns to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to send counsel and paintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/28/12. (kpr)
November 20, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 106 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 112 motion to supplement the record is denied without prejudice; defts' 97 motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/12. (vjt)
August 14, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 75 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 57 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendant Serena Brawley is dismissed from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/14/12. (kpr)
July 17, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file, within 15 days, responses to defts' 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and separate 99 Statement of Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/17/12. (kpr)
May 29, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 78 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/29/12. (vjt)
April 10, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 50 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's Motions for TRO 3 and Protective Order 20 , which the Court construes as Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/10/12. (vjt)
March 2, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve deft Serena Brawley at the address set forth in the defts' response without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/2/12. (kpr)
February 27, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Defts are directed to provide the last-known address for deft Brawley, under seal, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/27/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 30, 2012 Order denying his Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaMere v. Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinney
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelnut
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pennington
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birdsong
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Michael LaMere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?