Spencer v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Luke Larenzo Spencer
Defendant: Flowers, J Jacobs, Thomas and Mittenmire
Case Number: 4:2012cv00216
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff Luke Spencer's claims against defendants Ashley and Jacobs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/17/2013. (kdr)
February 28, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff, within 21 days of the date of this Order, to provide addresses at which Defendants Ashley and Jacob may be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/28/2013. (srw)
November 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Service; directing Defense counsel to submit the last known addresses for these Defendants within ten days of the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk of the Court to correct the style of the case to reflect the correct spelling of Defendant Mittermeier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/7/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mittenmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Larenzo Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?