Hood v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Terrell Wayne Hood
Defendant: Willie Owens, Durwin Lasker, Lloyd Vincent, John Randall, Faulkner County Detention Center, Jeff McMillian, Andrews and Huffman
Case Number: 4:2013cv00518
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 40 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/23/2014. (rhm)
November 14, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety and dismissing Defendants Faulkner County Detention Center, Randall, Vincent, Lasker, McMillian and Huffman with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2013. (rhm)
October 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Willie Owens and Sgt. Andrews, in care of the Faulkner County Detention Center, 500 South German Lane, Conway, AR 72034-7014. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and the 8 Amended Complaint on defendants without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/8/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durwin Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Wayne Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?