Ray v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Mary Ray
Defendant: Corizon and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 4:2013cv00628
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 11, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Ray's claims against all Defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/11/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as supplemented 37 PARTIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's claims against Williams and Mullins are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. Arkansas Department of Correction and Corizon are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)
November 20, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice, as premature. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?