McCall v. Winter et al

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Winter, Gullett, Stewart, Davis, Brown, Bowser, Pruett, Teel, Spaul, Flowers, Vincient and Shock
Case Number: 4:2014cv00238
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 94 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/29/2015. (jak)
January 8, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 50 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; denying 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/2015. (ks)
October 10, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Compel without prejudice as moot. Plaintiff is cautioned that the Court will not address future motions to compel, absent proof that he has attempted to resolve the discovery dispute with the Defendants prior to filing a motion with the Court, as required by FED.R.CIV.P. 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/10/2014. (jak)
August 11, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/11/2014. (rhm)
July 1, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Defendants Gullett, Brown, Bowser, and Govia are dismissed without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/2014. (jak)
May 7, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to file an Amended Complaint or to abide by the Court's above instructions will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/07/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Winter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?