Jones v. Saline County Jail

Plaintiff: James Jones
Defendant: Saline County Jail, Tonya Parker, Jasmine Booker and Christi Fullerton
Case Number: 4:2015cv00374
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 2 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2016. (mcz)
November 30, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff notify the Clerk of his new address within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/30/2015. (lej)
November 6, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 13 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim; dismissing plaintiff's official capacity claims against Booker without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/5/2015. (ks)
September 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Booker without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/14/2015. (lej)
July 28, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations.Defendants Saline County Jail, Tonya Parker and Christi Fullerton are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/28/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Saline County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?