Miller et al v. First Automotive Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller and Kaci Miller
Defendant: John Does, First Automotive Service Corporation and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00502
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Motion to Adopt Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative Motion to Stay All Proceedings on Behalf of Separate Defendant Memorandum Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to First Automotive Service Corporation's Motion to Adopt Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by First Automotive Service Corporation. (Brunson, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Motion to Adopt Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative Motion to Stay All Proceedings on Behalf of Separate Defendant filed by All Plaintiffs. (Crowder, William)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #9 , granted. Reply, No. 9-1, deemed filed. In the future, any moving party may reply within seven calendar days of the response. No sur-replies absent truly extraordinary circumstances because the moving party is entitled to the last written word. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2018. (thd)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kasten, Martin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document No. 1 - Excerpts from Retail Installment Contract and Waiver of Purchasers Right to Sue Agreement to Arbitrate)(Crowder, William)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #4 Motion to Compel. (jak)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Adopt Credit Acceptance Corporation's #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative Motion to Stay All Proceedings on Behalf of Separate Defendant by First Automotive Service Corporation (Brunson, Matthew) (Docket text modified on 8/21/2018 to establish linkage) (jak)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Kasten on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kasten, Martin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Brick, Phillip)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brick, Phillip)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by First Automotive Service Corporation.(kdr)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kaci Miller and Christopher Miller.(kdr)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Credit Acceptance Corporation from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-18-955. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT068203. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. First Automotive Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Automotive Service Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaci Miller
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?