Evans v. Buchman et al
Plaintiff: David Ray Evans
Defendant: Michael Henry and Joseph Buchman
Case Number: 4:2018cv00537
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by David Ray Evans. (cel)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's appeal of the 8/21/2018 order be denied #4 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/13/2018. (lej)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Ray Evans. (ljb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by David Ray Evans re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kdr)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Plaintiff must submit the statutory filing fee of $400, in full, within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/21/2018. (lej)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by David Ray Evans. (cel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Ray Evans. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Buchman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Buchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ray Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?