Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Rutledge et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Ho, Thomas Tvedten, Little Rock Family Planning Services and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma
Defendant: William L Rutledge, Matt Durrett, Don R Phillips, Nathaniel Smith, Omar T Atiq, Veryl D Hodges, John H Scribner, Timothy C Paden, Larry D Lovell, Rodney Griffin, Leslie Rutledge, David L Staggs, Sylvia D Simon, Brian T Hyatt, Rhys L Branman, Larry Jegley, Marie Holder and Robert Breving, Jr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00449
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs re #120 Notice of Appeal, (Cantrell, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 125 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number LIT073473 re #120 Notice of Appeal, filed by Brian T Hyatt, Omar T Atiq, Marie Holder, Veryl D Hodges, Robert Breving, Jr, Larry D Lovell, Sylvia D Simon, Timothy C Paden, Rodney Griffin, Nathaniel Smith, John H Scribner, Matt Durrett, Larry Jegley, William L Rutledge, Leslie Rutledge, Don R Phillips, David L Staggs, Rhys L Branman. (cmn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 Emergency MOTION to Enforce (Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For An Order Enforcing Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations And Imposing Sanctions) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Notice, #2 Exhibit B - July 29, 2019 Email)(Cantrell, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 123 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #120 Notice of Appeal, filed by Brian T Hyatt, Omar T Atiq, Marie Holder, Veryl D Hodges, Robert Breving, Jr, Larry D Lovell, Sylvia D Simon, Timothy C Paden, Rodney Griffin, Nathaniel Smith, John H Scribner, Matt Durrett, Larry Jegley, William L Rutledge, Leslie Rutledge, Don R Phillips, David L Staggs, Rhys L Branman. USCA Case Number 19-2690. Transcript due by 9/18/2019.(cmn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 122 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #120 Notice of Appeal re #29 Order, 14 Order, and #119 Preliminary Injunction. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK. (cmn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply Brief)(Bronni, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, 14 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, #119 Preliminary Injunction by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs. (Bronni, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 119 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/6/2019. (jbh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten (Notice Of Filing Of Documents Under Seal) (Godesky, Leah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Strike and for Other Appropriate Relief filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Godesky, Leah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 116 SEALED RESPONSE. (fjg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 115 AMICUS REPLY re #113 Motion for Leave to File by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 114 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #113 Motion for Leave to File Reply filed by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Reply by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2019, before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Court Reporter Margaret M. Kruse. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/12/2019. Redaction Request due 8/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019. (fcd)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying #95 defendants' request for a hearing. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/2/2019. (jbh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 110 SEALED EXHIBITS. (fjg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Strike and for Other Appropriate Relief by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF Notice of Pls.' Brief Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Jegley PI Hearing Excerpt)(Bronni, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #106 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #104 Second Supplemental Brief in Support. (jak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Godesky, Leah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 Second Supplemental Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Bronni, Nicholas)(Docket text modified on 8/2/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
July 31, 2019 Filing 105 SEALED Exhibits (jap)
July 31, 2019 Filing 104 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Brief in Support (Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of The LRFP Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction #2 ) filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Godesky, Leah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H6 - Tvedten DUI Letter and Incident Report, #2 Exhibit H7 - Solanky Testimony Excerpts from Jegley, #3 Exhibit H8 - Williams and Heflin Declaration Excerpts from Jegley, #4 Exhibit H9 - State Data Exhibit from Jegley, #5 Exhibit H10 - Harrison Supplemental Declaration, #6 Exhibit H11 - Ho and Williams Testimony Excerpts from Jegley, #7 Exhibit H12 - De Baca Declaration from Jegley, #8 Exhibit H13 - Redacted Solanky Supplemental Declaration)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 102 SEALED EXHIBIT. (fjg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 101 SEALED EXHIBIT. (fjg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 100 SEALED EXHIBIT. (fjg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Leah Godesky, Esq. In Opposition to Defendants' Request For A Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. re #95 Request, filed by Brian T Hyatt, Omar T Atiq, Marie Holder, Veryl D Hodges, Robert Breving, Jr, Larry D Lovell, Sylvia D Simon, Timothy C Paden, Rodney Griffin, Nathaniel Smith, John H Scribner, Matt Durrett, Larry Jegley, William L Rutledge, Leslie Rutledge, Don R Phillips, David L Staggs, Rhys L Branman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit PX0062 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Godesky, Leah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE re #95 Request, (Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Request For A Preliminary Injunction Hearing) by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten (Godesky, Leah)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying #86 defendants' motion for expedited preliminary-injunction-proceeding discovery and to shorten plaintiffs' time to respond to this motion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/30/2019. (jbh)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying #80 defendants' motion to strike latest declaration of Jason Lindo, Ph.D., and for other relief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/30/2019. (jbh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 95 REQUEST for For Preliminary-Injunction Hearing by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs. (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER declining to incorporate all the exhibits from Planned Parenthood Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma v. Jegley, Case No. 4:15-cv-00784-KGB, into the record in this case; and taking under advisement #86 defendants' motion for expedited preliminary-injunction-proceeding discovery. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/29/2019. (jbh)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #87 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "ORDER denying defendants' request to shorten plaintiffs' time to respond to the motion to dismiss. The merits of defendants' motion to dismiss remain under advisement, No. #57 ". (jak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 93 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 7/29/2019 re #90 Emergency MOTION to Enforce (Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For An Order Enforcing Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations And Imposing Sanctions) filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, et al. After arguments from counsel, the Court took the matter under advisement. A separate written order will be entered. (Present for plaintiff: Bettina Brownstein, Lea Godesky, Mai Ratakonda, Meagan Burrows, Susan Camp; Present for defendants: Michael Cantrell, Nicolas Bronni and Dylan Jacobs) (Court Reporter Margie Kruse) (tmw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Expedited Preliminary-Injunction-Proceeding Discovery MOTION to Shorten Time (LRFP Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Expedited Preliminary-Injunction-Proceeding Discovery And Motion To Quash Jegley Deposition Notice) filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godesky, Leah)
July 29, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF HEARING on #90 plaintiffs' emergency motion for an order enforcing plaintiffs' confidentiality designations and imposing sanctions: Hearing set for 7/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. The Court specifically directs that attorney Michael Cantrell be present on behalf of defendants. A representative for plaintiffs must also be present. (jbh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 90 Emergency MOTION to Enforce (Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For An Order Enforcing Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations And Imposing Sanctions) by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godesky, Leah)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to #86 defendant's motion by 12:00 p.m. noon C.T. on Monday, 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/26/2019. (jbh)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER setting briefing schedule with respect to plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/26/2019. (jbh)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying defendants' request to shorten plaintiffs' time to respond to the motion to dismiss. The merits of defendants' motion to dismiss remain under advisement, No. #57 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/26/2019. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/29/2019 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
July 25, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Expedited Preliminary-Injunction-Proceeding Discovery, MOTION to Shorten Time () by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Dylan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 7/19/2019, before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Court Reporter Elaine Hinson. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/1/2019. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (fcd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction held on 7/22/2019, before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Court Reporters Elaine Hinson, Judy Ammons, and Christa Jacimore. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/1/2019. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (fcd)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting #2 plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction to the extent the motion seeks a temporary restraining order, and denying #75 and #76 motions to strike. This Order shall expire on 8/6/2019 at 11:45 p.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/23/2019. (thd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Strike #79 Notice (Other), Motion to Strike Latest Lindo Declaration and for Other Relief filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godesky, Leah)
July 23, 2019 Filing 81 SEALED EXHIBITS. (fjg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Strike #79 Notice (Other), Motion to Strike Latest Lindo Declaration and for Other Relief by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Notice Of Correction Of The Record) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Lindo, PH. D.)(Godesky, Leah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 78 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 7/22/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs. After arguments from counsel and witness testimony, the Court took the matter under advisement. A separate written order will be entered. (Present for plaintiffs: Leah Godesky, Kelly Scavone, Taylor Simeone, Megan Burrows, Maithreyi Ratakonda and Bettina Brownstein; Present for defendants: Jennifer Merritt, Nicolas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, Julia Benafield, Michael Cantrell, and Vincent Wagner) (Court Reporters Elaine Hinson, Judy Ammons, and Christa Jacimore) (tmw)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER authorizing Dr. Janet Cathey, Dr. Tom Tvedten, Dr. Frederick Hopkins, Dr. Jason Lindo, Dr. Linda Prine, and Lori Williams to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, on Monday, 7/22/2019, subject to the rules in this order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/22/2019. (jbh)
July 21, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Strike #61 Reply to Response to Motion, #63 Declaration, #62 Declaration, Motion to Strike Belatedly Filed Supplemental Declarations; Motion to Strike Reply Brief by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
July 21, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Strike Certain Declarations and Attachments Thereto by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Godesky, Leah)
July 20, 2019 Filing 74 Witness List by Little Rock Family Planning Services(Godesky, Leah)
July 20, 2019 Filing 73 DECLARATION REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF DR. KATHI AULTMAN AND EXHIBITS A29 TO A43 & H3 TO H4 by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs. (Cantrell, Michael)
July 20, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying without prejudice #56 defendants' renewed motion for expedited prehearing discovery. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/2019. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER allowing the following individuals to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas on 7/22/2019 for a hearing in this case: Meagan Burrows, Leah Godesky, Kelly Scavone, Taylor Simeone, Mai Ratakonda, Francesa Riggione, Elizabeth Drew, Toni Hamp, Donna J. Harrison, M.D., Kathi Aultman, M.D., Tumulesh K.S. Solanky, Ph.D., and Judy McGruder. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/2019. (jak)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/2019. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 68 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 7/19/2019 re #56 Second MOTION for Discovery, Defendants' Renewed Motion for Expedited Prehearing Discovery, or Alternatively to Strike the Declarations of Jason Lindo; and Brief in Support MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to this Motion filed by Brian T Hyatt, et al. After arguments from counsel, the Court issued a ruling and will enter a separate written order. (Present for plaintiffs: Leah Godesky and Bettina Brownstein; Present for defendants: Vincent Wagner and Nicholas Bronni)(Court Reporter Elaine Hinson) (tmw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia C. Benafield on behalf of All Defendants (Benafield, Julia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 66 Witness List (purs. to FRCvP 26(a)(3)(A)(ii)) by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs.(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 65 Witness List by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten(Godesky, Leah)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - COURTROOM AND MEDIA PROTOCOL regarding the hearing to begin on 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/2019. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Christopher Attig by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion for TRO, filed by Thomas Tvedten, Stephanie Ho, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Little Rock Family Planning Services. (Godesky, Leah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 62 DECLARATION (Supplemental Declaration Of Brandon J. Hill, PhD) by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion for TRO, filed by Thomas Tvedten, Stephanie Ho, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Little Rock Family Planning Services. (Attachments: #1 Rebuttal Declaration Of Linda W. Prine, M.D., #2 Rebuttal Expert Declaration Of Jason Lindo, PH. D.)(Godesky, Leah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction) filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Godesky, Leah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 Second MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Renewed Motion for Expedited Prehearing Discovery, or Alternatively to Strike the Declarations of Jason Lindo; and Brief in Support MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to this Motion (Supplemental Opposition to Motion for Expedited Discovery and Cross Motion for a Protective Order) filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Godesky, Leah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE re #56 motion that the Court will hold a conference with the parties via telephone on Friday, 7/19/2019, at 2:00 p.m. C.T. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/18/2019. (ljb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 58 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #57 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Cantrell, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 56 Second MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Renewed Motion for Expedited Prehearing Discovery, or Alternatively to Strike the Declarations of Jason Lindo; and Brief in Support, MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to this Motion () by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 55 Witness List by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List)(Godesky, Leah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 54 Witness List (purs. to FRCvP 26(a)(3)(A)(ii)) by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs.(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 53 EXHIBITS to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B42 - B52, #2 Exhibit C11 - C14, #3 Exhibit D1 - D6, #4 Exhibit E1 - E6, #5 Exhibit F11 - F18)(fjg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Merritt on behalf of All Defendants (Merritt, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits re #49 Addendum Attachment 10 Exhibit H2 Declaration of Judy McGruder filed by All Defendants. H1 Lucas DVD and H2 Judy's Story DVD filed conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's office. (fjg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by All Defendants re #43 Response in Opposition to Motion NOTICE OF EXHIBITS FILED CONVENTIONALLY (Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 49 ADDENDUM filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G1 Decl. of Allan Parker with 15 affidavits of women hurt by abortion, #2 Exhibit G2 Decl. of Millie Lace, #3 Exhibit G3 Decl. of Mischa Martin, #4 Exhibit G4 Decl. of Kristie Hayes, #5 Exhibit G5 Decl. of Mary Silfies, #6 Exhibit G6 Decl. of Kathi Aultman, #7 Exhibit G7 Decl of Donna Harrison, #8 Exhibit G8 Decl. of Tumulesh Solanky, #9 Exhibit G9 Planned Parenthood Moving Ark Dem Gaz, #10 Exhibit H2 Decl. of Judy McGruder)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 48 ADDENDUM filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F1 to F10)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 47 ADDENDUM filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C1 to C10)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 46 ADDENDUM filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B31 to B41, #2 Exhibit B53 to B59)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 45 ADDENDUM filed by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B1 to B10, #2 Exhibit B11 to B20, #3 Exhibit B21 to B30)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 44 ADDENDUM filed by Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs to #43 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 to A10, #2 Exhibit A11 to A20, #3 Exhibit A21 to A28)(Cantrell, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Defendants. (Cantrell, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying without prejudice #26 motion for expedited prehearing discovery. If they wish to do so, defendants may renew their motion for expedited discovery after the hearing set for 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/15/2019. (ljb)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #38 motion to strike or request for additional time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/2019. (jbh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed with Plaintiffs by Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs. (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Strike #36 Brief in Support, #37 Declaration, MOTION TO STRIKE OR TO PERMIT DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO NEW MOTION FOR TRO/PI (Plaintiffs Little Rock Family Planning Services And Dr. Thomas Tvedten's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Strike) filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Godesky, Leah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Strike #36 Brief in Support, #37 Declaration, MOTION TO STRIKE OR TO PERMIT DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO NEW MOTION FOR TRO/PI by All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION (Supplemental Expert Declaration Of Jason Lindo, Ph.D., In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For a Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction) by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion for TRO, filed by Thomas Tvedten, Stephanie Ho, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Little Rock Family Planning Services. (Godesky, Leah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Motion for TRO, (Plaintiffs Little Rock Family Planning Services And Dr. Thomas Tvedten's Supplemental Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction) filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Godesky, Leah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer regarding any outstanding discovery requests by 12:00 p.m. noon C.T. on Thursday, 7/11/2019; and further directing the parties to file a joint status report by 10:00 a.m. C.T. on Friday, 7/12/2019, describing any outstanding disputes regarding discovery that the parties request the Court resolve. Defendants' #26 motion for expedited prehearing discovery remains under advisement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Expedited Prehearing Discovery; and Brief in Support MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to This Motion filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Godesky, Leah)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #32 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. (jak)
July 6, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Stephanie Ho, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon J. Hill, PhD)(Godesky, Leah)(Docket text mModified on 7/8/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING denying #19 defendants' request to extend to 7/22/2019, defendants' time to respond to the complaint and to respond to the request for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction; denying #25 plaintiffs' request that the Court, if it grants defendants' request for an extension, also grant plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order; and granting #19 defendants' request to conduct a hearing on plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction on 7/22/2019. A hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction will be conducted on 7/22/2019, at 9:00 a.m. Parties are directed to exchange copies of exhibits and written lists of witnesses by 12:00 p.m. on 7/18/2019. Rebuttal exhibits and written lists of rebuttal witnesses are due by 12:00 p.m. on 7/19/2019. Objections to the Court's consideration of exhibits are due by 8:00 a.m. on 7/22/2019. Defendants' responsive pleading remains due on 7/18/2019. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction is due by 9:00 a.m. C.T. on 7/17/2019. Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of their motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction is due by 9:00 a.m. C.T. 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/2019. (jbh)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to #26 motion by 12:00 p.m. C.T. on 7/8/2019 and taking under advisement defendants' request for expedited discovery. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/2019. (jbh)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #22 defendants' expedited motion to reconsider ex parte consolidation order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/2019. (jbh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re 15 Notice of Reassignment, 14 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, Defendants' Expedited Motion to Reconsider Ex Parte Consolidation Order MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to this Motion (Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Of The Consolidation Order And Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request For Related-Case Designation) filed by Stephanie Ho, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godesky, Leah)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #24 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #22 Motion as marked on the Order. (jak)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #20 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Meagan Burrows, Leah Godesky, Kendall Turner, Taylor Simeone, Kelly Scavone, Susan Talcott Camp, and Maithreyi Ratakonda. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/2019. (jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Expedited Prehearing Discovery; and Brief in Support, MOTION to Expedite , MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to This Motion () by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to this Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Attorney Brioni to Court, #2 Exhibit Email from Attorney Godesky to Attorney Brioni, #3 Exhibit Email from Attorney Brioni to Godesky)(Brownstein, Bettina)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to defendants' expedited #22 motion to reconsider ex parte consolidation order by 4:00 p.m. C.T. on 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/2019. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/3/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 Motion for Reconsideration,, Motion to Shorten Time, and Statement Opposing "Related Case" Designation filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Bronni, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re 15 Notice of Reassignment, 14 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, Defendants' Expedited Motion to Reconsider Ex Parte Consolidation Order, MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to this Motion () by All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to #19 defendants' motion by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/1/2019. (jbh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Maithreyi Ratakonda filed by all Plaintiffs. Fee $100 received. Receipt #LIT072815. (fjg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to this Motion () by All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Moore Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Wagner, Vincent)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Jacob Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (un-redacted image file). The correct document was substituted as the main document for docket entry #2 based on the request from the filing party and pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel. (jbh)
June 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION #4 Brief in Support, #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #4 was modified to establish linkage to #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and or Preliminary Injunction. The docket text for docket entry #5 was modified to establish linkage to #3 Motion for Expedited Consolidation. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 4:15-cv-00784-KGB per 14 Order. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 14 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to United States District Judge Kristine Baker for consolidation with case 4:15CV00784-KGB. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/19. (mmb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Susan Talcott Camp. (Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT072752). Filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kelly Scavone. (Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT072755). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Taylor Simeone. (Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT072754). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kendall Turner. (Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT072756). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Leah Godesky. (Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT072753). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Meagan Burrows. (Fee of $100 paid. Receipt number LIT072751). Filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF LITTLE ROCK FAMILY PLANNING SERVICES' DISCLOSURE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by Little Rock Family Planning Services. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF ARKANSAS & EASTERN OKLAHOMA'S DISCLOSURE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' #3 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSOLIDATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO GIVE NOTICE OF A RELATED CASE filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 6/27/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' #2 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 6/27/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSOLIDATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO GIVE NOTICE OF A RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072757.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Rutledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Rutledge
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Durrett
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don R Phillips
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Smith
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar T Atiq
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veryl D Hodges
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Scribner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Paden
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D Lovell
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Griffin
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Staggs
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia D Simon
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Hyatt
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhys L Branman
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Holder
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Breving, Jr
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ho
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Represented By: Rebecca R. Jackson
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tvedten
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Rebecca R. Jackson
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock Family Planning Services
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Rebecca R. Jackson
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Represented By: Rebecca R. Jackson
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?